Urbanec v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robin Urbanec
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01307
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER noting and so ordering stipulation of dismissal of the defendant, McKesson Corporation. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/24/20. (Codeanne, K.)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 motion to stay to and including 12/15/20; granting #36 motion to amend/correct. The current deadlines shall be extended by 90 days. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/15/20. (Covello, Alfred)
September 14, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #35 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines [correction made to caption only] by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party McKesson Corporation without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation with Certificate of Service (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020.(Bozek, M.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020.(Bozek, M.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020.(Bozek, M.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/2/2020.(Bozek, M.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2020. Discovery due by 3/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020.(Bozek, M.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02706. Modified on 9/3/2020 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #19 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Alma Concha's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2700 opened); b. Plaintiff Brian Ganoe's case be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division of the middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2701 opened); c. Plaintiff Cornelia Hunter's case be severed and transferred to the Jacksonville Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2702 opened); d. Plaintiff Stanley Keim's case be severed and transferred to the Indianapolis Division of the Southern District of Indiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2703 opened); e. Plaintiff Sarah Roth's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Western District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2704 opened); f. Plaintiff Debbie Thompson's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2705 opened); g. Plaintiff Robin Urbanec's case be severed and transferred to the Hartford Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2706 opened); and h. Plaintiff Hazel Wehrle's case be severed and transferred to the Covington Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2707 opened). Plaintiff Kathy Shaw is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (jmg)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Dismissing Parties. Party James Saitas terminated. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/25/2020) (oyh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ***PLEASE DISREGARD FILED IN WRONG CASE*** Order: Before the Court are defendants Medical City Healthcare and Medical City Las Colinas's motion to dismiss [Doc. No. #15 ] and lead plaintiff Pearl De Leons motion to certify the class [Doc. No. #18 ]. For the following reasons, the Court finds it premature to decide the motions on their merits. Therefore, the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE both motions. In the meantime, the Court ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSES this case, which will reopen upon the parties' filing of their joint status report and amended proposed scheduling order. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/24/2020) (ndt) Modified on 8/24/2020 (ndt).
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Alma Concha, Brian Ganoe, Cornelia Hunter, Stanley Keim, Sarah Roth, James Saitas, Debbie Thompson, Robin Urbanec, Hazel Wehrle re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Alma Concha, Brian Ganoe, Cornelia Hunter, Stanley Keim, Sarah Roth, James Saitas, Debbie Thompson, Robin Urbanec, Hazel Wehrle re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs, MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Alma Concha, Brian Ganoe, Cornelia Hunter, Stanley Keim, Sarah Roth, James Saitas, Debbie Thompson, Robin Urbanec, Hazel Wehrle (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Alma Concha, Brian Ganoe, Cornelia Hunter, Stanley Keim, Sarah Roth, James Saitas, Kathy Shaw, Debbie Thompson, Robin Urbanec, Hazel Wehrle re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Alma Concha, Brian Ganoe, Cornelia Hunter, Stanley Keim, Sarah Roth, James Saitas, Kathy Shaw, Debbie Thompson, Robin Urbanec, Hazel Wehrle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alma Concha, Brian Ganoe, Cornelia Hunter, Stanley Keim, Sarah Roth, James Saitas, Kathy Shaw, Debbie Thompson, Robin Urbanec, Hazel Wehrle (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 12 replaced with flattened document on 6/23/2020) (pnp).
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/15/2020) (chmb)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10913526) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation to C.R. Bard, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation to McKesson Corp., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Notice of Dismissal Hearing, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, Inc., #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urbanec v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Urbanec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?