Sepelak v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Sepelak
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01308
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/14/2020 (Tooker, Aimee)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Stay; granting #38 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/14/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines [correction made to caption only] by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Stipulation of Dismissal to term party McKesson Corporation. Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 9, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party McKesson Corporation without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation with Certificate of Service (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASES Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 09/03/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 09/03/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020 Discovery due by 3/5/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2021 Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 3, 2020 Filing 27 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02691.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #20 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows:a. Plaintiff Rudy Adkinss case be severed and transferred to the Toledo Division of the Northern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2683-S opened); b. Plaintiff Reginald Crosbys case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Northern District of Illinois (Civil case 3:20-cv-2684-S opened); c. Plaintiff Darcy Duncans case be severed and transferred to the Syracuse Division of the Northern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2685-S opened); d. Plaintiff Marie Joness case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Middle District of Alabama (Civil case 3:20-cv-2686-S opened);e. Plaintiff Jeffrey Osborns case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2687-S opened);f. Plaintiff Stephen Pietericks case be severed and transferred to the San Antonio Division of the Western District of Texas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2688-S opened);g. Plaintiff Norma Renterias case be severed and transferred to the Las Cruces Division of the District of New Mexico (Civil case 3:20-cv-2689-S opened);h. Plaintiff Steve Robersons case be severed and transferred to the Charlotte Division of the Western District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2690-S opened);i. Plaintiff Katherine Sepelaks case be severed and transferred to the New Haven Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2691-S opened). Plaintiff Elzie Newsom is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (axm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Reginald Crosby (Schulte, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***DISREGARD, WRONG ORDER***ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla) Modified on 7/16/2020 (mla).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/10/2020) (svc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900478) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 2020-04-07 Original Petition, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 2020-04-07 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 2020-04-07 Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 2020-06-04 State Court Docket, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 2020-05-06 Return of Service - McKesson Corp, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard) (Jarreau, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sepelak v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Sepelak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?