Khesin v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Khesin
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01361
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/16/2020. (Tisdale, I.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 15, 2020 to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Bennici, Gregory)
October 14, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/16/2020. (Perez, J.)
October 9, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Imbriani, Susan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants filed by Daniel Khesin. (Ellis, Hudson)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Bennici, Gregory)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aetna Life Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Khesin, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 9/10/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/10/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/10/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020; Discovery due by 3/12/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/10/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 10, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 10, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Ellis, Hudson)
September 10, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Ellis, Hudson)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6088476.), filed by Daniel Khesin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jeffrey Headrick, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Hudson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khesin v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Khesin
Represented By: Hudson Taylor Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?