Obegenski v. Sun Life Financial et al
Plaintiff: Adminstratrix Linda Obegenski and Linda Obegenski
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (US), Sun Life Financial and Sun Insurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 3:2020cv01408
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sun Insurance Company of Canada waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020 filed by Linda Obegenski. (Brower, Charles)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Linda Obegenski, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/18/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/18/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2020, Discovery due by 3/20/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 18, 2020 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6105430.), filed by Linda Obegenski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brower, Charles) Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct filed against party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obegenski v. Sun Life Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adminstratrix Linda Obegenski
Represented By: Charles F. Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Obegenski
Represented By: Charles F. Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (US)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Insurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?