Ventus Wireless, LLC v. Larson & Toubro Infotech Limited et al
Plaintiff: Ventus Wireless, LLC
Defendant: Larson & Toubro Infotech Limited and LTI Infotech Financial Service Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01461
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to LTI Infotech Financial Service Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 filed by Ventus Wireless, LLC. (Altman, Richard)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Larson & Toubro Infotech Limited waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 filed by Ventus Wireless, LLC. (Altman, Richard)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ventus Wireless, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ventus Holdings, LLC for Ventus Wireless, LLC. (Altman, Richard)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Ventus Wireless, LLC, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/28/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2020, Discovery due by 3/27/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 25, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-6119627.), filed by Ventus Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Altman, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ventus Wireless, LLC v. Larson & Toubro Infotech Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ventus Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larson & Toubro Infotech Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTI Infotech Financial Service Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?