USA v. Morton et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: LLSC, LLC Agent of d/b/a Connecticut Driving Institute, Lee P Morton and LLSC, LLC doing business as Connecticut Driving Institute
Case Number: 3:2020cv01491
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Request to Enter Default. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed by 12/25/2020 or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2020. (Shafer, J.)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Morton and LLSC, LLC by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Default)(Sciarrino, Christine)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Lee P Morton served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Military Service)(Sciarrino, Christine)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. LLSC, LLC served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Sciarrino, Christine)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *LLSC, LLC, Lee P Morton* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christine L. Sciarrino* *U.S. Attorney's Office-NH* *157 Church St., 25th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Velez, F.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/30/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2020; Discovery due by 4/1/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/30/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 30, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 30, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Sciarrino, Christine)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Sciarrino, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Morton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLSC, LLC Agent of d/b/a Connecticut Driving Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee P Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLSC, LLC doing business as Connecticut Driving Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Christine L. Sciarrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?