Fitzpatrick v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Fitzpatrick
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc. and Cook Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv01509
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. (Oliver, T.)
December 2, 2020 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:20-cv-06277, filed 12/02/2020. (Oliver, T.)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 11/25/2020. (Peterson, M)
November 25, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Peterson, M)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe, APS* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Peterson, M)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Nicholas Fitzpatrick, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/06/2020. (Peterson, M)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/05/2020. (Peterson, M)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/05/2020. (Peterson, M)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2020. Discovery due by 4/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/05/2020. (Peterson, M)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6136326.), filed by Nicholas Fitzpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moskow, Neal)
October 5, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
October 5, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
October 5, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Group, Inc.. (Moskow, Neal)
October 5, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical LLC. (Moskow, Neal)
October 5, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 5, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to William Cook Europe APS. (Moskow, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzpatrick v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe, APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Neal Lewis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?