Fairfield v. One Commerce Drive, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Town of Fairfield, Connecticut and Town of Fairfield
Defendant: One Commerce Drive, LLC, Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC and British Motor Works, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01514
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot #18 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) in light of #19 motion to withdraw; granting #19 Motion to Withdraw; finding as moot #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in light of #19 motion to withdraw. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/10/2020. (Burlingham, Corinne)
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to One Commerce Drive, LLC; British Motor Works, LLC until 12/06/2020 by British Motor Works, LLC, One Commerce Drive, LLC. (Dechello, Anthony)
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw #18 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to One Commerce Drive, LLC; British Motor Works, LLC by Town of Fairfield. (Miller, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to One Commerce Drive, LLC; British Motor Works, LLC by Town of Fairfield. (Miller, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony R. Dechello on behalf of British Motor Works, LLC, One Commerce Drive, LLC (Dechello, Anthony)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant-Pustola & Associates to file responsive pleadings is extended to 12/6/2020 for good cause. Counsel for the Defendant-Pustola & Associates has just recently been retained, additional time to prepare is necessary due to the complexity of the allegations in the amended complaint, this is the first extension of time, and the extension is brief. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/3/2020. (Burlingham, Corinne)
November 3, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC to 12/6/2020 per Dkt. 16 Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva Kolstad on behalf of Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC (Kolstad, Eva)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 6, 2020 to File a Responsive Pleading by Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC. (Keller, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Keller on behalf of Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC (Keller, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town of Fairfield. Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. (Miller, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town of Fairfield. British Motor Works, LLC served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020; One Commerce Drive, LLC served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. (Miller, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael L Miller* *Wiggin and Dana LLP, One Century Tower* *265 Church Street* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Shafer, J.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *British Motor Works, LLC, One Commerce Drive, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael L Miller* *Wiggin and Dana LLP, One Century Tower* *265 Church Street* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Shafer, J.)
October 13, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to British Motor Works, LLC, One Commerce Drive, LLC. (Miller, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC. (Miller, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Town of Fairfield, #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Amended Complaint filed by Town of Fairfield, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Town of Fairfield, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2020. (Velez, F.)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of Town of Fairfield (Doroghazi, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against British Motor Works, LLC, One Commerce Drive, LLC, Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC, filed by Town of Fairfield.(Miller, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/5/2020. (Velez, F.)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/5/2020. (Velez, F.)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/5/2020. (Velez, F.)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2020; Discovery due by 4/6/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2020. (Velez, F.)
October 5, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6136846.), filed by Town of Fairfield, Connecticut.(Miller, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairfield v. One Commerce Drive, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Commerce Drive, LLC
Represented By: Anthony R. Dechello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pustola & Associates Engineers/Constructors, LLC
Represented By: Eva Kolstad
Represented By: Michael R. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Motor Works, LLC
Represented By: Anthony R. Dechello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Fairfield, Connecticut
Represented By: Michael L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Fairfield
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: Michael L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?