Prewo et al v. Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karl Prewo and Karen Prewo
Defendant: Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01735
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Responses due by 2/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Deflaration of Christopher Drury, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher Drury)(Drury, Christopher)
January 5, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Drury, Christopher)
January 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Drury on behalf of Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Drury, Christopher)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 15, 2021 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/14/2020. (Powell, G.)
December 14, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 1/15/2021. (Powell, G.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelcie Burns Reid on behalf of Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Reid, Kelcie)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Varney on behalf of Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Varney, Nicholas)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 15, 2021 to file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint, by Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Robinson, John)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Robinson, John)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karl Prewo, Karen Prewo. All Plaintiffs. (Denniston, Garrett)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Haverty on behalf of Karl Prewo and Karen Prewo, h/w (Haverty, Kevin)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Attorney Kevin Haverty to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2020. (Oliver, T.)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin Haverty to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6248582) by Karen Prewo, Karl Prewo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kevin Haverty, Esq., #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NJ, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing PA)(Denniston, Garrett)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Garrett A. Denniston* *Lynch, Traub, Keefe & Errante, P.C.* *52 Trumbull St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Karl Prewo, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/19/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/19/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2021. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/25/2021. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6231763.), filed by Karl Prewo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Denniston, Garrett)
November 19, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Plaintiffs. (Denniston, Garrett)
November 19, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prewo et al v. Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Represented By: Nicholas Varney
Represented By: Kelcie Burns Reid
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Prewo
Represented By: Garrett A. Denniston
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Prewo
Represented By: Garrett A. Denniston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?