Tov V'Chesed Foundation v. Ghent et al
Plaintiff: Tov V'Chesed Foundation
Defendant: Thomas W. Calkins, Blue Ribbon, LLC, Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC, Lawlor Title Group, LLC, John Devine, Robert E. Ghent, John Devine & Associates, Ansoina Developers, LLC, John Devine Law Firm LLP, Moustapha Diakhate, Charles A. Liberti, Raymond R. Miller, Sr., Ansonia Developers, LLC, Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC and John Devine Law Firm
Case Number: 3:2020cv01919
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Moustapha Diakhate and Ansonia Developers, LLC by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. (Swanson, Adam)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Defendants Robert E. Ghent, Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC and Lawlor Title Group, LLC's #30 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint until 2/26/2021. All counsel are directed to review the Court's #5 Chambers' Practices regarding electronic filing, at page 1, including font type of all filings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/5/2021. (Nault, James)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Answer deadline updated for Robert E. Ghent, Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC, and Lawlor Title Group, LLC to 2/26/2021 per Dkt. 31 Order. (Shafer, J.)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2021To File a Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Robert E. Ghent, Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC, Lawlor Title Group, LLC. (Errante, Steven)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendant Thomas W. Calkins' #28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint until 3/5/2021. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/4/2021. (Nault, James)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Answer deadline updated for Thomas W. Calkins to 3/5/2021 per Dkt. 29 Order. (Shafer, J.)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 5, 2021 to Plead by Thomas W. Calkins. (Houlihan, Thomas)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Houlihan, Jr on behalf of Thomas W. Calkins (Houlihan, Thomas)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Scannell on behalf of Thomas W. Calkins (Scannell, Timothy)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant Liberti, Miller, and Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC's ("Blue Ribbon") #24 Amended Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint until 2/26/2021. Defendant Liberti, Miller, and Blue Ribbon's #23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED as moot in light of the Court's grant of the Dkt. 24 Amended Motion. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/27/2021. (Nault, James)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2021 answer, move or otherwise appear with respect to the Plaintiff's complaint #23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2021 answer, move or otherwise appear with respect to the Plaintiff's complaint #1 Complaint, #1 Complaint by Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC. (Shah, Sanjit)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Answer deadline updated for Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC, Charles A. Liberti, and Raymond R. Miller, Sr. to 2/26/2021 per Dkt. 24 Order. (Shafer, J.)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2021 answer, move or otherwise appear with respect to the Plaintiff's complaint #1 Complaint by Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC. (Shah, Sanjit)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjit S Shah on behalf of Raymond R. Miller, Sr (Shah, Sanjit)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjit S Shah on behalf of Charles A. Liberti (Shah, Sanjit)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjit S Shah on behalf of Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC (Shah, Sanjit)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service Signed By Sharix A. Alicea filed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. (Swanson, Adam)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Errante on behalf of Robert E. Ghent, Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC, Lawlor Title Group, LLC (Errante, Steven)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalie D. Louis on behalf of Robert E. Ghent, Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC, Lawlor Title Group, LLC (Louis, Rosalie)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC served on 1/9/2021, answer due 1/30/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Raymond R. Miller, Sr served on 1/9/2021, answer due 1/30/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Charles A. Liberti served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Swanson on behalf of Tov V'Chesed Foundation (Swanson, Adam)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Moustapha Diakhate served on 1/2/2021, answer due 1/23/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Ansonia Developers, LLC served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Lawlor Title Group, LLC served on 1/2/2021, answer due 1/23/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC served on 1/2/2021, answer due 1/23/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. Robert E. Ghent served on 1/2/2021, answer due 1/23/2021. (Swanson, Adam)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ansonia Developers, LLC, Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC, Thomas W. Calkins, John Devine, Moustapha Diakhate, Robert E. Ghent, Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC, John Devine & Associates, John Devine Law Firm, Lawlor Title Group, LLC, Charles A. Liberti, Raymond R. Miller, Sr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Adam Michael Swanson* *McCarter & English, LLP* *One Canterbury Green, 201 Broad Street* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Shafer, J.)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, and #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2020. (Shafer, J.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/23/2020. (Shafer, J.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/23/2020. (Shafer, J.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/23/2020. (Shafer, J.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2021; Discovery due by 6/24/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 12/23/2020. (Shafer, J.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Walker, J.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6293996.), filed by Tov V'Chesed Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Parties)(Swanson, Adam)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Swanson, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tov V'Chesed Foundation v. Ghent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Calkins
Represented By: Timothy R. Scannell
Represented By: Thomas H. Houlihan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ribbon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghent Realty Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Errante
Represented By: Rosalie D. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawlor Title Group, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Errante
Represented By: Rosalie D. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Ghent
Represented By: Steven J. Errante
Represented By: Rosalie D. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Devine & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansoina Developers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Devine Law Firm LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moustapha Diakhate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Liberti
Represented By: Sanjit S Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond R. Miller, Sr.
Represented By: Sanjit S Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansonia Developers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ribbon Appraisals, LLC
Represented By: Sanjit S Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Devine Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tov V'Chesed Foundation
Represented By: Adam Michael Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?