Thomas L. Pearson and the Pearson Family Members Foundation et al v. University of Chicago
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Pearson and Thomas L. Pearson and the Pearson Family Members Foundation
Defendant: University of Chicago
Petitioner: George Ledwith
Case Number: 3:2020mc00092
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-6206877) filed by George Ledwith. (Daniels, Benjamin)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 EXHIBIT 12 to The University of Chicago's (Redacted) Response to Petitioner George Ledwith's Amended Motion to Quash Deposition and Document Subpoena by University of Chicago re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Harris, Mitchell)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT 1 to University of Chicago's (Redacted) Response to Petitioner George Ledwith's Amended Motion to Quash Deposition and Document Subpoena by University of Chicago re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Harris, Mitchell)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition (University of Chicago's Response) re #3 Amended MOTION to Quash with Supporting Exhibits filed by University of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15)(Harris, Mitchell)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 Sealed Document: The University of Chicago's Response to Petitioner George Ledwith's Amended Motion to Quash Deposition and Document Subpoena and Exhibits 2, 6, 11 and 14 to the Response (Unredacted -- Filed Under Seal) by University of Chicago re #12 MOTION to Seal The University of Chicago's Motion to Seal the Unredacted Version of its Response to Petitioner George Ledwith's Motion to Quash AND Exhibits 2, 6, 11 and 14 to the Response . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Unredacted Version of University's Response, #2 Exhibit 6 to the Unredacted Version of The University's Response, #3 Exhibit 11 to the University's Unredacted Version of its Response, #4 Exhibit 14 to the University's Unredacted Version of its Response)(Harris, Mitchell)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal The University of Chicago's Motion to Seal the Unredacted Version of its Response to Petitioner George Ledwith's Motion to Quash AND Exhibits 2, 6, 11 and 14 to the Response by University of Chicago. (Harris, Mitchell)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Baak on behalf of University of Chicago (Baak, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Hall on behalf of University of Chicago (Hall, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey A. Hall. Signed by Clerk on 11/23/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew C. Baak. Signed by Clerk on 11/23/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Daniels on behalf of George Ledwith (Daniels, Benjamin)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey A. Hall to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6235781) by University of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harris, Mitchell)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew C. Baak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6235769) by University of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harris, Mitchell)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell R. Harris on behalf of University of Chicago (Harris, Mitchell)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Amended MOTION to Quash with Supporting Exhibits by George Ledwith.Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of George Ledwith in Support of Motion to Quash)(Diemand, Timothy)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 11/6/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 6, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-6206877), filed by George Ledwith.Responses due by 11/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Quash Deposition and Document Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B to Motion to Quash and Document Subpoena, #3 Declaration of George Ledwith)(Diemand, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas L. Pearson and the Pearson Family Members Foundation et al v. University of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Pearson and the Pearson Family Members Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Ledwith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Diemand
Represented By: Benjamin M. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Chicago
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Hall
Represented By: Mitchell R. Harris
Represented By: Andrew Baak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?