Davis v. Money Source Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paulette Davis
Defendant: ServiceLink Field Services, LLC and Money Source Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00047
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 1, 2021 Answer deadline updated for ServiceLink Field Services, LLC to 3/15/2021. (Ferguson, L.)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendants Joint Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. #14 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants have until March 15, 2021 to file their response. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/1/2021. (Burks, L.)
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Money Source Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PinkRock Holdings, Inc. (Polansky, Kevin) Modified on 3/3/2021 to edit text to include the name of the Corporate Parent (Ferguson, L.).
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until March 15, 2021Servicelink Field Services, LLC and Money Source Inc. Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint by ServiceLink Field Services, LLC. (Blatchley, Thomas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ServiceLink Field Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ServiceLink Holdings, Inc. for ServiceLink Field Services, LLC. (Blatchley, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Money Source Inc. to 3/6/2021. (Ferguson, L.)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #11 ) is hereby GRANTED. The deadline for the defendant to file a response to plaintiff's complaint is March 6, 2021. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/4/2021. (Burks, L.)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 6, 2021 to Answer the Complaint #1 Complaint by Money Source Inc.. (Polansky, Kevin)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Consent Motion for Extension of Time until March 6, 2021 to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/1/2021. (Ferguson, L.)
February 1, 2021 Answer deadline updated for ServiceLink Field Services, LLC to 3/6/2021. (Ferguson, L.)
January 30, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 6, 2021 to file a responsive pleading to complaint #1 Complaint by ServiceLink Field Services, LLC. (Blatchley, Thomas)
January 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Blatchley on behalf of ServiceLink Field Services, LLC (Blatchley, Thomas)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paulette Davis. Money Source Inc. served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021; ServiceLink Field Services, LLC served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021. (Gentes, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Money Source Inc., ServiceLink Field Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey S Gentes* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center or Yale Law School* *60 Popieluszko Court or PO Box 209090* *Hartford, CT 06106 or New Haven CT 06520*. (Agati, Kathryn)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Paulette Davis, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/13/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/13/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2021, Discovery due by 7/15/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2021. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6325956.), filed by Paulette Davis.(Gentes, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Gentes, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2021 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Money Source Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServiceLink Field Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Money Source Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?