Waugh v. ViacomCBS Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Waugh
Defendant: Crane Co., Foster Wheeler LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Viacom Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corp and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00145
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Set deadline: motion for substitution due by 5/23/2021 per Dkt. 26. (Shafer, J.)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. A #25 suggestion of the Plaintiff's death was filed in this case on February 22, 2021. Pursuant to Rule 25(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff's successor or representative may filed a motion for substitution by no later than May 23, 2021. If a motion for substitution is not filed within said time, the action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/25/2021. (Burlingham, Corinne)
February 22, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay re #24 Suggestion of Death by Robert Waugh.Responses due by 3/15/2021 (Arscott, Amity)
February 22, 2021 Filing 24 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff, Robert Waugh by Robert Waugh. (Arscott, Amity)
February 11, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,, by defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC by Crane Co.(individually and/or as parent, alter ego and/or).(Lyons, Thomas)
February 10, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #17 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #17 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Oswald, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Oswald, James)
February 9, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Gibbons on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Gibbons, Brian)
February 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Kincaid on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Kincaid, Kelly)
February 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Oswald on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Oswald, James)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Felice, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Felice, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Joinder in the Removal (Felice, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Standing Protective Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #1 Notice of Removal filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Exhibit filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #9 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Velez, F.)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by ViacomCBS Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Martin, Robert)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/3/2021. (Velez, F.)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/3/2021. (Velez, F.)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/3/2021. (Velez, F.)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2021; Discovery due by 8/5/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2021. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2021. (Velez, F.)
February 3, 2021 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc.. (Martin, Robert)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by ViacomCBS Inc. of No Pending Motions (Martin, Robert)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc. (Martin, Robert)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ViacomCBS Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-cv-21-6049710-s. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6365968, filed by ViacomCBS Inc..(Martin, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2021: #1 CORRECTED PDF) (Freberg, B).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waugh v. ViacomCBS Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kelly A. Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Gibbons
Represented By: John R Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kelly A. Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Waugh
Represented By: Amity L. Arscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?