Save the Sound, Inc. v. Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority
Plaintiff: Save the Sound, Inc.
Defendant: Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority
Case Number: 3:2021cv00177
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case has been reported settled, and the parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal, with prejudice. See Doc. #34 . The Clerk is directed to close this case. Either party may move to reopen this case on or before June 24, 2022. This deadline may be extended only for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in full compliance with Local Rule 7. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 5/27/2022. (Teague, J.)
May 27, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Caffrey, A.)
May 25, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal by Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority (Heath, Edward)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re: Doc. #32 . The parties' Joint Status Report is acknowledged. The parties' Joint Status Report states: "[T]he parties have reached a settlement and memorialized the terms in writing. The parties expect to exchange signature pages for that settlement agreement within the next week. The parties will promptly thereafter file with the court a notice pursuant to D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 41(b)." Doc. #32 at 1. Accordingly, on or before June 3, 2022, the parties shall file either: (1) a stipulation of dismissal; or (2) a Joint Status Report informing the Court of the status of the parties' settlement efforts. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 5/16/2022. (Teague, J.)
May 16, 2022 Filing 32 Joint STATUS REPORT by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Fiedler, Katherine)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Joint Motion for Modification of Revised Scheduling Order. The parties have "move[d] to extend by approximately thirty (30) days the upcoming deadlines regarding expert witnesses." Doc. #30 at 1. The parties' Joint Motion is GRANTED in light of their representation that "the Parties are currently finalizing terms of a written settlement agreement and believe that they will be in a position to report the matter as settled within the next thirty (30) days." Id. at 2. The interim discovery deadlines proposed by the parties (Doc. #30 at 1) are hereby approved. The parties shall promptly notify the Court if they reach a settlement of this matter. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 4/25/2022. (Teague, J.)
April 25, 2022 Filing 30 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Modification of Scheduling Order by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Fiedler, Katherine)
February 15, 2022 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Fiedler, Katherine)
February 15, 2022 Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/16/2022. (Katz, S.)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery shall be completed by August 2, 2022. Dispositive motions shall be filed by September 13, 2022. The parties shall file their Joint Trial Memorandum on or before October 14, 2022. The interim discovery deadlines proposed by the parties (Doc. #27 at 1-2) are hereby approved. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/8/2022. (Teague, J.)
February 8, 2022 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Modification of Scheduling Order by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Fiedler, Katherine)
February 8, 2022 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/2/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2022; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 10/14/2022. (Teague, J.)
November 22, 2021 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Fiedler, Katherine)
November 22, 2021 Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2022. (Katz, S.)
November 15, 2021 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/22/2021 (Caffrey, A.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The parties have filed a Joint Status Report (Doc. #24 ), assertedly in response to the Court's Revised Scheduling Order and Case Management Plan (Doc. #23 ). While the Joint Status Report provides some important information, it does not provide most of the information required by the Court's Order. See Doc. #23 at 4. Accordingly, on or before November 22, 2021, counsel shall confer and file an updated Joint Status Report providing the information required. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 11/15/2021. (Katz, S.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Fiedler, Katherine)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2021; Discovery due by 6/3/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2022; Trial Brief due by 8/15/2022. Counsel shall review the attached Order carefully, noting all interim deadlines, discovery procedures, and other matters. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 11/4/2021. (Katz, S.)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/14/2021.(Walker, J.)
June 28, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 6/3/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2022 Trial Brief due by 1/16/2023 (Lewis, D)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court has reviewed and hereby APPROVES AS MODIFIED the deadlines specified in the Parties' #20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Accordingly, the Court establishes the schedule for this case as follows. Initial disclosures will be served by July 9, 2021. Plaintiff will be allowed until September 3, 2021 to file motions to join additional parties or file motions to amend the pleadings. Motions filed after the foregoing date will require, in addition to any other requirements under the applicable rules, a showing of good cause for the delay. Defendant will be allowed until October 4, 2021 to file motions to join additional parties or to file a response to the complaint, or any amended complaint. Motions filed after the foregoing date will require, in addition to any other requirements under the applicable rules, a showing of good cause for the delay. All discovery, including depositions of expert witnesses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(4) will be commenced by July 1, 2021 and completed (not propounded) by June 3, 2022. Depositions will commence by September 1, 2021 and be completed by May 27, 2022. Parties will designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which they bear the burden of proof by March 1, 2022. Depositions of any such experts will be completed by April 11, 2022. Parties will designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which they do not bear the burden of proof by May 2, 2022. Depositions of such experts will be completed by June 3, 2022. A damages analysis will be provided by any party who has a claim or counterclaim for damages by March 1, 2022. Summary judgment motions will be filed on or before July 15, 2022. Oppositions to summary judgment motions will be filed on or before August 15, 2022. Replies, if any, shall be filed on or before August 30, 2022. The Joint Trial Memorandum required by the Standing Order on Trial Memoranda in Civil Cases will be filed by January 16, 2023, or thirty (30) days after the Court rules on any dispositive motion, whichever is later. The case will be ready for trial thirty (30) days after the filing of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 28, 2021. (Noble, N.)
June 21, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fiedler, Katherine)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent opposition, Defendant's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Accordingly, Defendant's Answer provided on April 29, 2021 is hereby deemed timely. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 5, 2021. (Noble, N.)
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority.(Heath, Edward)
April 13, 2021 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2021 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority. (Scoville, Jenna)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger F. Reynolds on behalf of Save the Sound, Inc. (Reynolds, Roger)
March 3, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority to 4/15/2021. (Barry, Donna)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time, absent objection and for good cause shown. Accordingly, Defendant must answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 15, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 3, 2021. (Noble, N.)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 03/01/21. (Barry, Donna)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/1/2021. (Shafer, J.)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Scoville on behalf of Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority (Scoville, Jenna)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Hug on behalf of Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority (Hug, Christopher)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2021 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority. (Heath, Edward)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Heath on behalf of Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority (Heath, Edward)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Save the Sound, Inc. (Fiedler, Katherine)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Fiedler, Katherine)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Save the Sound, Inc., #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/2021.(Velez, F.)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/10/2021. (Velez, F.)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/10/2021. (Velez, F.)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/10/2021.(Velez, F.)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2021; Discovery due by 8/12/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2021. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/21. (Velez, F.)
February 10, 2021 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6378444.), filed by Save the Sound, Inc..(Fiedler, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Save the Sound, Inc. v. Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save the Sound, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Fiedler
Represented By: Roger F. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority
Represented By: Christopher John Hug
Represented By: Edward J. Heath
Represented By: Jenna Scoville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?