Lakner v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Plaintiff: George S. Lakner
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00270
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss [Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss] filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Rich, Brian)
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss scheduled for 5/24/2021 at 3:00 PM will be conducted via Zoom. All parties and members of the public may use the Zoom access information to observe the proceeding by video or by audio. A Zoom link is also publicly available on the Court's webpage for "Court Calendars." (Gutierrez, Y.)
April 21, 2021 NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Motion Hearing re: #11 Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 5/24/2021 at 3:00 PM will be conducted via Zoom. For the duration of the COVID-19 pandemic, Judge Meyer conducts all civil case hearings exclusively by Zoom video/audio or by means of an audio teleconference. Any member of the public may observe the hearing by means of video or audio. For video hearings, the Court uses the Zoom video/audio platform, and the access information is set forth below and also appears on the Court's "Court Calendars" webpage, https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/court_calendars. The Zoom platform allows a person to click a link for video access or to call in to a telephone number for audio-only access to the video hearing. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1608930611?pwd=K2tmcHVsNTNvZU5GMncyYVhpS2RQUT09 and call in number is +16468287666,,1608930611#,,,,*612741#.Meeting ID: 160 893 0611 Meeting Password: 612741 Federal law prohibits any electronic recording or rebroadcasting of a federal court hearing. No person may engage in any recording or rebroadcasting of any part of a Zoom video/audio hearing including by means of using their computer or any other device to video-record or audio-record any part of the hearing or to take photographs or screenshots of the hearing. A violation may result in court sanctions or criminal prosecution. (Gutierrez, Y.)
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by George S. Lakner. (Habib, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/19/2021. (Freberg, B)
April 16, 2021 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss until 04/19/21 by George S. Lakner. (Willcutts, Thomas)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING DECISION ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Based upon the Court's review of the parties' Rule 26(f) report, the Court STAYS discovery pending its resolution of the pending motion to dismiss and will enter a scheduling order if it does not grant the motion to dismiss. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/5/2021. (DeBot, B.)
April 4, 2021 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Habib, Michael)
March 26, 2021 Filing 17 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Rich, Brian)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss.Responses due by 4/16/2021. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/25/2021. (Freberg, B)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss until April 16, 2021 by George S. Lakner. (Habib, Michael)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DENIES without prejudice the motion for extension of time (Doc. #13 ) for failure to "include a statement of the movant that (1) the movant has inquired of all non-moving parties and there is agreement or objection to the motion, or that (2) despite diligent effort, including making the inquiry in sufficient time to afford non-movant a reasonable opportunity to respond, the movant cannot ascertain the position(s) of the non-movant(s)." D. Conn. L. Civ. R.7(b)(2). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/24/2021. (Freberg, B)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss until April 16, 2021 by George S. Lakner. (Habib, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Rich, Brian)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.Responses due by 3/26/2021 (Rich, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by George S. Lakner. (Habib, Michael)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Habib on behalf of George S. Lakner (Habib, Michael)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, #1 Notice of Removal filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, #7 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/2/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/2/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2021; Discovery due by 9/1/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/2/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rich, Brian)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal of No Pending Motions (Rich, Brian)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal (Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rich, Brian)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV21-6138204-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6415089, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rich, Brian)
March 2, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lakner v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George S. Lakner
Represented By: Thomas P. Willcutts
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Willcutts
Represented By: Michael J Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?