Roa v. Alsuraimi et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Roa
Defendant: New Britain Auto Sales, Consumer Law Group LLC, Daniel S Blinn, AK Auto Sales and Repairs LLC and Mohammed Alsuraimi
Case Number: 3:2021cv00362
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 21 Joint RESPONSE re #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, 18 Notice,,,, by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales Joint Statement of Parties Regarding Delay in Filing Joint Rule 26F. (Greene, Kevin)
May 11, 2021 NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Status Conference scheduled for 5/17/21 at 4:00pm will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1607804254?pwd=azhMTTREMXluTEN2cjlNR1NlZlJ0UT09 Call in number is 1-646-828-7666.Meeting ID: 160-780-4254 Meeting Password: 296737Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Johnson, D.)
May 10, 2021 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/17/2021 04:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Michael P. Shea. (Johnson, D.)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) report and will hold a zoom status conference prior to issuing a scheduling order. The status conference will be held on Monday, May 17, 2021 at 4:00pm. Zoom access information will be posted on the docket and on the Court Calendar. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/10/2021.(Gait, Emily)
May 7, 2021 Filing 19 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Greene, Kevin)
May 3, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/12/2021 (Johnson, D.)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties' compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty-four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties file on or before Wednesday, May 12, 2021 (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a Form 26(f) report; or (2) a Form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties' failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint and/or monetary sanctions being imposed on counsel. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/3/2021.(Gait, Emily)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel S Blinn, Consumer Law Group LLC. (West, Liam)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike by Wanda Roa. Responses due by 5/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
April 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service by Wanda Roa (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Payton, R.)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Daniel S Blinn, Consumer Law Group LLC.(West, Liam)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/1/21. (Barry, Donna)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam M. West on behalf of Daniel S Blinn, Consumer Law Group LLC (West, Liam)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales.(Greene, Kevin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Standing Protective Order, #5 Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court, filed by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales, #6 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases filed by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales, #3 Notice of No Pending Motions in State Court filed by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin J. Greene on behalf of Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales, #8 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 03/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/17/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/17/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2021. Discovery due by 9/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 03/17/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Greene, Kevin) Modified on 3/17/2021 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice of Removal and State Court S&C))(Greene, Kevin) Modified on 3/17/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales. (Greene, Kevin) Modified on 3/17/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales re #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE OF NO PENDING MOTIONS IN STATE COURT (Greene, Kevin) Modified on 3/17/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Greene on behalf of Mohammed Alsuraimi, New Britain Auto Sales (Greene, Kevin) Modified on 3/17/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Britain Auto Sales, Mohammed Alsuraimi from New Britain Superior Court, case number HHB-CV21-5028970. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6435303, filed by New Britain Auto Sales , Mohammed Alsuraimi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court S&C))(Greene, Kevin) Modified on 3/17/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
March 17, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roa v. Alsuraimi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Britain Auto Sales
Represented By: Kevin J. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Law Group LLC
Represented By: Liam M. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S Blinn
Represented By: Liam M. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK Auto Sales and Repairs LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Alsuraimi
Represented By: Kevin J. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Roa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?