Kaul v. Murphy
Plaintiff: Richard Arjun Kaul
Defendant: Michael Murphy, Connecticut General Life Insurance, Federation of State Medical Boards, Christopher J. Christie, AQR Capital, Allstate Insurance Company, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, Doreen Annette Hafner, Connecticut Medical Board, Abbott Brown and Gregory Kaufman
Case Number: 3:2021cv00439
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Compel; denying #21 Motion for Reconsideration; denying #24 Motion to Stay as moot in light of the Court's Dkt. 26 dismissal of this action following Plaintiff's Dkt. 20 Notice that he intended to litigate it in the DIstrict of New Jersey and had re-filed it there. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/30/2021. (Nault, James)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff, in his letter to the Court, Dkt. 20, indicates that the case "has been re-filed in the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, and thus there is no requirement for the case to be transferred," which the Court construes to mean that the Plaintiff seeks to withdraw this case from this District and will prosecute it in the District of New Jersey. Thus, this case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party in light of Plaintiff's Dkt. 20 Notice. The Clerk is directed to maintain this case closed and not transfer it to the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/30/2021. (Nault, James)
April 29, 2021 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines filed by Federation of State Medical Boards. (Schulz, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Federation of State Medical Boards.Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Schulz, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federation of State Medical Boards. (Schulz, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Schulz on behalf of Federation of State Medical Boards (Schulz, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Reconsideration/Vacatur of Order re #18 Order of Transfer, by Richard Arjun Kaul. (Reis, Julia)
April 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE re: Filing in District of New Jersey by Richard Arjun Kaul (Reis, Julia)
April 26, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Confer Under Rule 26(f) by Richard Arjun Kaul. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER sua sponte transferring this case in the interests of justice to the District of New Jersey for the reasons set forth in the attached Order. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/23/2021. (Nault, James)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as moot in light of Plaintiff's payment of the appropriate filing fee. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/23/2021. (Nault, James)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER sealing confidential documents. ORDER sealing Exhibits 6 and 7, Dkts. 13-5 and 13-6, in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5(e)3. This order is based on the Court's finding that the materials to be sealed contain confidential information concerning a third-party person's medical condition. See Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 ("HIPAA"); Local R. Civ. P. 5(e)3 ("A statute mandating or permitting the non-disclosure of a class of documents (e.g., personnel files, health care records, or records of administrative proceedings) provides sufficient authority to support an order sealing such documents.") (emphasis added). The confidentiality of medical records outweighs the public's right to know. See Northrop v. Carucci, No. 3:04cv00103 (RNC), 2007 WL 685173, at *3 (D. Conn. Mar. 5, 2007) ("[F]ederal law treats medical records as confidential.") (citing HIPAA). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/23/2021. (Nault, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 RICO Case Statement by Richard Arjun Kaul (Reis, Julia)
April 20, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Arjun Kaul. Christopher J. Christie served on 4/11/2021, answer due 5/2/2021; Doreen Annette Hafner served on 4/11/2021, answer due 5/2/2021; Gregory Kaufman served on 4/11/2021, answer due 5/2/2021; Abbott Brown served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021; New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021; Allstate Insurance Company served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021; Federation of State Medical Boards served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Reis, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, #3 Exhibit filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #9 Electronic Summons Issued, #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, #11 Electronic Summons Issued Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2021. (Reis, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *AQR Capital, Allstate Insurance Company, Abbott Brown, Christopher J. Christie, Connecticut General Life Insurance, Connecticut Medical Board, Federation of State Medical Boards, Doreen Annette Hafner, Gregory Kaufman, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Richard Arjun Kaul* *440c Somerset Drive* *Pearl River, NY 10965*. (Caffrey, A.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Murphy, Christopher J. Christie, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, Connecticut Medical Board, AQR Capital, Federation of State Medical Boards, Doreen Annette Hafner, Abbott Brown, Connecticut General Life Insurance, Gregory Kaufman, Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Richard Arjun Kaul.(Reis, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to AQR Capital, Allstate Insurance Company, Abbott Brown, Christopher J. Christie, Connecticut General Life Insurance, Connecticut Medical Board, Federation of State Medical Boards, Doreen Annette Hafner, Gregory Kaufman, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners. (Caffrey, A.)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Michael Murphy* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Richard Arjun Kaul* *440c Somerset Drive* *Pearl River, NY 10965*. (Caffrey, A.)
April 7, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Michael Murphy. (Caffrey, A.)
April 7, 2021 Filing fee received from Richard Arjun Kaul: $ 402, receipt number 783508 (Caffrey, A.) Modified text to add receipt number on 4/8/2021 (Caffrey, A.).
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, #3 Exhibit filed by Richard Arjun Kaul, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices Signed by Clerk on 3/31/2021. (Reis, Julia) Modified on 4/2/2021 (Reis, Julia).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/30/2021. (Reis, Julia)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/30/2021. (Reis, Julia)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/30/2021. (Reis, Julia)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2021. Discovery due by 9/29/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2021. (Reis, Julia)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 Manual Filing of Exhibits 1-22 to #1 Complaint, filed in flash drive format by Richard Arjun Kaul. (Reis, Julia)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Arjun Kaul. (Reis, Julia)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Murphy, filed by Richard Arjun Kaul. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaul v. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Arjun Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federation of State Medical Boards
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQR Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Annette Hafner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?