Gaskins v. Rollins et al
Plaintiff: Irene Gaskins
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company and Leslie P. Rollins
Case Number: 3:2021cv00440
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 21 Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Irene Gaskins. Leslie P. Rollins served on 3/6/2021, answer due 3/27/2021. (McCormack, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 20 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McCormack, Michael)
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/28/2021to File Rule 26(f) Report by Irene Gaskins. (McCormack, Michael) Modified docket text on 5/12/2021 to correct date (Reis, Julia).
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Irene Gaskins. (McCormack, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendant Leslie Rollins has failed to plead or otherwise respond to the complaint. If she fails to file an answer or other responsive pleading in this court within 21 days of this order, default will enter, which could result in the entry of default judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/10/2021. (Powell, G.)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendant Leslie P. Rollins by Irene Gaskins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McCormack, Michael)
May 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. McCormack on behalf of Irene Gaskins (McCormack, Michael)
April 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K. Huffer on behalf of Bankers Life and Casualty Company (Huffer, Steven)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven K. Huffer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6480806) by Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Gemmell, Ian)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Attorney Steven K. Huffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/22/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/23/2021. (Oliver, T.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven K. Huffer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6480806) by Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gemmell, Ian)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bankers Life and Casualty Company.(Gemmell, Ian)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Bankers Life and Casualty Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Ian James Gemmell on behalf of Bankers Life and Casualty Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bankers Life and Casualty Company, #4 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Bankers Life and Casualty Company, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bankers Life and Casualty Company, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 03/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2021. Discovery due by 9/29/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 03/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Gemmell, Ian)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Bankers Life and Casualty Company STATEMENT PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gemmell, Ian)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Bankers Life and Casualty Company of No Pending Motions (Gemmell, Ian)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian James Gemmell on behalf of Bankers Life and Casualty Company (Gemmell, Ian)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bankers Life and Casualty Company from Hartford County Superior Court, case number HHD-CV21-6139522-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6451336, filed by Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Gemmell, Ian)
March 30, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaskins v. Rollins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Gaskins
Represented By: Robert M. Elliott
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ian James Gemmell
Represented By: Steven K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie P. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?