Ortega v. Moran
Plaintiff: Sonia Ortega
Defendant: Courtney E Moran
Case Number: 3:2021cv00485
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Set deadlines: Responsive pleading due by June 20, 2021. (Alexander, R.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery shall be complete on or before 1/7/2022; the parties may file dispositive motions on or before 2/4/2022; the parties shall file their joint trial brief on or before 3/4/2022; and the case shall be trial ready on 4/1/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 05/07/21. (Covello, Alfred)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading to and including June 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 04/29/21. (Covello, Alfred)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 20, 2021to file responsive pleading by Courtney E Moran. (Donohue, James)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Donohue on behalf of Courtney E Moran (Donohue, James)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonia Ortega. Courtney E Moran served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Marshal Return)(Williams, John)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Courtney E Moran* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Bozek, M.)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonia Ortega, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint filed by Sonia Ortega. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2021.(Bozek, M.)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/7/2021.(Bozek, M.)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2021. Discovery due by 10/7/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021.(Bozek, M.)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Sonia Ortega (Williams, John)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Ortega against Courtney E Moran ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6462369.), filed by Sonia Ortega.(Williams, John)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Courtney E Moran. (Williams, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Ortega
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney E Moran
Represented By: James W. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?