Homesite Ins. Co. v. Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Homesite Ins. Co.
Defendant: Play N Learn Child Day Care, LLC, Amanda Gluse, Sharon Cruz and Daniel Cruz
Case Number: 3:2021cv00511
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amanda Gluse.(Secola, Carl)
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A. Secola, Jr on behalf of Amanda Gluse (Secola, Carl)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Play N Learn Child Day Care, LLC waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021 filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Ringold, James)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sharon Cruz waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021 filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Ringold, James)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Daniel Cruz waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021 filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Ringold, James)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Homesite Ins. Co.. Amanda Gluse served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Ringold, James)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Daniel Cruz, Sharon Cruz, Amanda Gluse, Play N Learn Child Day Care, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Efrem Ringold* *Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford* *150 South Main Street* *Wallingford, CT 06492*. (Imbriani, Susan)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Homesite Ins. Co.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Efrem Ringold* *Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford* *150 South Main Street* *Wallingford, CT 06492*. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 4/15/2021 (Imbriani, Susan).
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Homesite Ins. Co., #1 Complaint filed by Homesite Ins. Co., #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 04/14/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/14/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/14/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2021. Discovery due by 10/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homesite Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Homesite Securities Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Homesite Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent AMFAM, Inc., Corporate Parent American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Corporate Parent AmFam Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company for Homesite Insurance Company. (Ringold, James)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6470880.), filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (redated underlying complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Certified policy))(Ringold, James)
April 14, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 14, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Daniel Cruz, Sharon Cruz, Amanda Gluse, Play N Learn Child Day Care, LLC. (Ringold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homesite Ins. Co. v. Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Play N Learn Child Day Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gluse
Represented By: Carl A. Secola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Ins. Co.
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?