Rojas v. Guadarrama et al
Plaintiff: Luis V. Rojas
Defendant: Jesus Guadarrama and Luis Colon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00573
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by Luis Colon, Jesus Guadarrama OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Beizer, Matthew)
June 17, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Beizer on behalf of Luis Colon, Jesus Guadarrama (Beizer, Matthew)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The plaintiff's motion for entry for default (ECF No. #17 ) is denied as premature. The date by which the defendants are to respond to the complaint, July 9, 2021, has not yet passed. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/16/21. (Constantine, A.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The plaintiff's second motion to appoint counsel (ECF No. #16 ) is denied for the reasons set forth in the Court's prior order dated June 1, 2021. See ECF No. 15. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/16/21. (Constantine, A.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to all defendants by Luis V. Rojas. (Peterson, M)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, the plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel #11 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/1/21. (Constantine, A.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 EXHIBITS by Luis V. Rojas. (Peterson, M)
May 20, 2021 Filing 13 Witness List by Luis V. Rojas (Peterson, M)
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Luis V. Rojas. (Freberg, B)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jesus Guadarrama waiver sent on 5/10/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Peterson, M)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Luis V. Rojas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
May 10, 2021 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jesus Guadarrama and Luis Colon on 5/10/2021. Waiver of Service due by 6/14/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order re: Initial Discovery Disclosures Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/07/2021. (Peterson, M)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER: See attached order. The requests for damages against the defendants in their official capacities and the requests for declaratory and injunctive relief are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). The case will proceed on the Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claim against the defendants in their individual capacities. 1. The Clerk shall verify the current work addresses for defendants Guadarrama and Colon with the Department of Correction Office of Legal Affairs, mail a waiver of service of process request packet containing the Complaint and this Order to each defendant at the address provided within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, and report to the court on the status of the waiver request on the thirty-fifth day after mailing. If any defendant fails to return the waiver request, the Clerk shall make arrangements for in-person service by the U.S. Marshals Service on the defendant in his individual capacity and the defendant shall be required to pay the cost of such service.2.The Clerk shall send the plaintiff a copy of this Order. 3. The Clerk shall send a courtesy copy of the Complaint and this Order to the Connecticut Attorney General and the Department of Correction Office of Legal Affairs. 4. The defendants shall file their response to the complaint, either an answer or motion to dismiss, within sixty (60) days from the date the waiver forms are sent. If they choose to file an answer, they shall admit or deny the allegations and respond to the cognizable claim recited above. They also may include all additional defenses permitted by the Federal Rules. 5. All discovery must be completed by 12/6/2021. All dispositive motions must be filed by 1/5/2022. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/7/21.(Constantine, A.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 4/30/21. (Payton, R.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Luis V. Rojas (Payton, R.)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/26/2021. (Peterson, M)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 04/26/2021. (Peterson, M)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/26/2021. (Peterson, M)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 PRISCS: Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Luis V. Rojas. (Peterson, M)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS: MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luis V. Rojas. (Peterson, M)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS: COMPLAINT against Luis Colon, Jesus Guadarrama, filed by Luis Colon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (Peterson, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas v. Guadarrama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis V. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Guadarrama
Represented By: Matthew B. Beizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Colon
Represented By: Matthew B. Beizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?