Beavin et al v. William W. Backus Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Eric M Beavin and William Beavin
Defendant: Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Indramattie Joseph, Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Backus Corporation, Paul J. Schwartz, United Community and Family Services, Inc., Geetha R. Swamy Iyah, Hartford Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital, Alfred Caudullo and USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00579
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by United Community and Family Services, Inc..(Lyons, Thomas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Geetha R. Swamy Iyah.(Lyons, Thomas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Edward Leone, Jr on behalf of Alfred Caudullo (Leone, Donald)
June 17, 2021 Filing 26 First AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR UCFS served on RITA KULIKOWSKI on JUNE 9, 2021, filed by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin. (DeAngelo, Terrance)
June 16, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Community and Family Services, Inc.. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of United Community and Family Services, Inc. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 7, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Geetha R. Swamy Iyah (Lyons, Thomas)
June 2, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Terrance DeAngelo* *Barrett DeAngelo LLC* *1221-1223 Locust Street* *Philadelphia, PA 19107*. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 1, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United Community and Family Services, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Terrance DeAngelo* *Barrett DeAngelo LLC* *1221-1223 Locust Street* *Philadelphia, PA 19107*. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 1, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to USA. (DeAngelo, Terrance)
May 31, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hartford HealthCare Corporation waiver sent on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/3/2021; Indramattie Joseph waiver sent on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/3/2021; William W. Backus Hospital waiver sent on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/3/2021; Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; Geetha R. Swamy Iyah waiver sent on 4/30/2021, answer due 6/29/2021; Paul J. Schwartz waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; Backus Corporation waiver sent on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/3/2021; Alfred Caudullo waiver sent on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/3/2021; USA waiver sent on 5/18/2021, answer due 7/17/2021; Hartford Hospital waiver sent on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/3/2021 filed by Eric M Beavin; William Beavin. (DeAngelo, Terrance)
May 31, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael F. Barrett, Esq., Terrance R. DeAngelo, Esq., Joseph G. DeAngelo, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $600 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6487514) by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin. (DeAngelo, Terrance)
May 31, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to United Community and Family Services, Inc.. (DeAngelo, Terrance)
May 28, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Backus Corporation, Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, Indramattie Joseph, William W. Backus Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Hartford HealthCare Corporation for Hartford Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital. (Meerbergen, Jessica)
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica D. Meerbergen on behalf of Backus Corporation, Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, Indramattie Joseph, William W. Backus Hospital (Meerbergen, Jessica)
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert J. Shepardson on behalf of Backus Corporation, Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, Indramattie Joseph, William W. Backus Hospital (Shepardson, Herbert)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin re #14 Amended Complaint (DeAngelo, Terrance)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED R CIV P 15(a)(2) against All Defendants, filed by William Beavin, Eric M Beavin.(DeAngelo, Terrance)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Sutton on behalf of Alfred Caudullo (Sutton, Anthony)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 First EXHIBIT by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin re #1 Complaint. (DeAngelo, Terrance)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance DeAngelo on behalf of Eric M Beavin, William Beavin (DeAngelo, Terrance)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance DeAngelo on behalf of Eric M Beavin, William Beavin (DeAngelo, Terrance)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance DeAngelo on behalf of Eric M Beavin, William Beavin (DeAngelo, Terrance)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear for Attorneys Michael F. Barrett, Esq., Terrance R. DeAngelo, Esq., and Joseph G. DeAngelo, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 6/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael F. Barrett, Esq., Terrance R. DeAngelo, Esq., Joseph G. DeAngelo, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $600 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6487514) by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael F. Barrett, Esq., #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Terrance R. DeAngelo, Esq., #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph G. DeAngelo, Esq.)(Taubes, Alexander)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin, #2 Notice of Related Case filed by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/28/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/28/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2021, Discovery due by 10/28/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Eric M Beavin, William Beavin (Taubes, Alexander)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6486797.), filed by William Beavin, Eric M Beavin.(Taubes, Alexander)
April 28, 2021 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beavin et al v. William W. Backus Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indramattie Joseph
Represented By: Jessica D. Meerbergen
Represented By: Herbert J. Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford HealthCare Corporation
Represented By: Jessica D. Meerbergen
Represented By: Herbert J. Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backus Corporation
Represented By: Jessica D. Meerbergen
Represented By: Herbert J. Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Community and Family Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geetha R. Swamy Iyah
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Hospital
Represented By: Jessica D. Meerbergen
Represented By: Herbert J. Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Backus Hospital
Represented By: Jessica D. Meerbergen
Represented By: Herbert J. Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Caudullo
Represented By: Anthony D. Sutton
Represented By: Donald Edward Leone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric M Beavin
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Represented By: Terrance DeAngelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Beavin
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Represented By: Terrance DeAngelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?