Ford v. Bankers Standard Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: David Ford
Defendant: Ace Limited, Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Co and Chubb Group Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00658
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss until August 23, 2021 by David Ford. (Biller, Jon)
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb Group Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laurie, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb Group Holdings Inc..Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Laurie, Robert)
June 16, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Ace American Insurance Company to 7/2/2021; Bankers Standard Insurance Co to 7/2/2021; Chubb Group Holdings Inc. to 7/2/2021. (Blue, A.)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint to and including July 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/15/21. (Codeanne, K.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 2, 2021to Respond to Complaint by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb Group Holdings Inc.. (Laurie, Robert)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb Group Holdings Inc.. (Samuel, Stacey)
May 25, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Ace American Insurance Company to 6/18/2021; Ace Limited to 6/18/2021; Bankers Standard Insurance Co to 6/18/2021; Chubb Group Holdings Inc. to 6/18/2021. (Alexander, R.)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint to and including 06/18/21. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 05/24/21. (Covello, Alfred)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 18, 2021 to respond to Complaint by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Chubb Group Holdings Inc.. (Samuel, Stacey)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order, and #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/12/2021.(Bozek, M.)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/11/2021. Discovery due by 11/11/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/12/2021.(Bozek, M.)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.. (Laurie, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. of Statement of Compliance with Standing Order of Removed Cases (Laurie, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. of Pending Motions (Laurie, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Liz Samuel on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. (Samuel, Stacey)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Laurie on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. (Laurie, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ace American Insurance Company, Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Company from Superior Court at Hartford, case number HHD-CV21-6140742-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6506787, filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Laurie, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Bankers Standard Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Represented By: Stacey Liz Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Represented By: Stacey Liz Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Represented By: Stacey Liz Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ford
Represented By: Jon David Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?