Great Meadow Cafe v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Great Meadow Cafe
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00661
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/23/2021to File Rule 26(f) Report by Great Meadow Cafe. (McCormack, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cincinnati Insurance Company, filed by Great Meadow Cafe.(McCormack, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss .(Responses due by 7/2/2021, ), or ( Amended Complaint due by 7/2/2021), Answer deadline updated for Cincinnati Insurance Company to 7/30/2021. (Johnson, D.)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The (ECF No. #17 ) motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss or file an amended complaint by July 2, 2021. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's July 2nd filing by July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/21/2021. (Gait, Emily)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss until 07/2/2021 by Great Meadow Cafe. (McCormack, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendant has filed a #13 Motion to Dismiss. On or before June 25, 2021, Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which it pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendant's memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after June 25, 2021. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendant renews its motion to dismiss, Defendant may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/16/21. (Constantine, A.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (ECF No. #14 ) until June 25, 2021 in which to respond to the defendant's motion #13 is granted. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/16/21. (Constantine, A.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss .(Responses due by 6/25/2021, ), or ( Amended Complaint due by 6/25/2021) (Johnson, D.)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss until 06/25/2021 by Great Meadow Cafe. (McCormack, Michael)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Cincinnati Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Adams, Kathleen)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/14/2021.(Bozek, M.)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Jensen on behalf of Great Meadow Cafe (Jensen, Timothy)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. McCormack on behalf of Great Meadow Cafe (McCormack, Michael)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #8 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, #7 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/12/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/12/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/11/2021, Discovery due by 11/11/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/12/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Cincinnati Insurance Company Notice to Counsel Re: Local Rule 5(b) (Adams, Kathleen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Cincinnati Insurance Company Notice of Pending Motions (Adams, Kathleen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company Notice of Removal Statement (Adams, Kathleen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Adams, Kathleen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV21-6140889-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6506940, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Adams, Kathleen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Meadow Cafe v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Meadow Cafe
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Represented By: Timothy P. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen F. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?