Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co v. ADT Commercial LLC
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co
Defendant: ADT Commercial LLC and Red Hawk Fire and Security LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00687
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brice Nengsu Kenfack. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brice Nengsu Kenfack to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568352) by ADT Commercial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Berglund, Curtis)
July 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis A Berglund on behalf of ADT Commercial LLC (Berglund, Curtis)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - It has come to the Court's attention that counsel for the Defendant has failed to file a notice of appearance as required under Local Rule 5(b). Counsel for the Defendant is Ordered to file a notice of appearance forthwith. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/6/2021.(Gould, K.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus Kirk on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co (Kirk, Thaddeus)
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Zielinski on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. A response shall be filed on or before July 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/1/2021. (Banker, Joshua)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thaddeus S. Kirk. Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2021. (Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey M. Zielinski. Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2021. (Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thaddeus S. Kirk to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6558523) by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Donnelly, Derek)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey M. Zielinski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6558507) by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Donnelly, Derek)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss until July 27, 2021 by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Donnelly, Derek)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT Commercial LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADT, Inc. for ADT Commercial LLC. (Berglund, Curtis)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ADT Commercial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 2012 Contract, #2 Exhibit B: 2005 Contract)(Berglund, Curtis)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by ADT Commercial LLC.Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Berglund, Curtis)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. ADT Commercial LLC served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Donnelly, Derek)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *ADT Commercial LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 05/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2021. Discovery due by 11/17/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2021. Signed by Clerk on 05/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADT Commercial LLC f/k/a Red Hawk Fire and Security LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6513957.), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Valley Community Baptist Church.(Donnelly, Derek)
May 18, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to ADT Commercial LLC f/k/a Red Hawk Fire and Security LLC. (Donnelly, Derek)
May 18, 2021 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co v. ADT Commercial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT Commercial LLC
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Hawk Fire and Security LLC
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Represented By: Thaddeus Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?