Nazarian v. Garland, et al
Plaintiff: Serima Nazarian
Defendant: Sue Raufer, Tracy Renaud, Alejandro Mayorkas and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 3:2021cv00693
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fazekas, J.)
June 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sue Raufer, Tracy Renaud (McConaghy, Michelle)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting on consent #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before July 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/21/2021. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 2, 2021 to Respond to the #1 Complaint, by Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sue Raufer, Tracy Renaud. (McConaghy, Michelle)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lynn McConaghy on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sue Raufer, Tracy Renaud (McConaghy, Michelle)
May 21, 2021 Answer deadline updated for all Defendants to 7/2/2021. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2021.(Fanelle, N.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/19/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/19/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2021 Discovery due by 11/18/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2021 Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-00720. Modified on 5/20/2021 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' #6 motion to transfer. It is ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint remains June 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/5/21. (lcabj2)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendants' #5 notice, the matter will be assigned to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes if both parties complete the consent form. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/5/21. (lcabj2)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to the Complaint by MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SUE RAUFER, TRACY RENAUD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge by MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SUE RAUFER, TRACY RENAUD (Yee, Marsha)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of All Defendants (Yee, Marsha)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/30/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/30/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/29/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MERRICK GARLAND served on 3/30/2021; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 3/30/2021; SUE RAUFER served on 3/30/2021; TRACY RENAUD served on 3/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Sethi, Sanjay) Modified on 4/28/2021 to correct serve/answer due date (zjf).
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SUE RAUFER, TRACY RENAUD. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SUE RAUFER, TRACY RENAUD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8314881) filed by SERIMA NAZARIAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Sethi, Sanjay)
March 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazarian v. Garland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Raufer
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serima Nazarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?