Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00699
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management PlanDiscovery due by 1/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2022. Status Report due by 10/27/2021. Trial Brief due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/27/2021. (Reis, Julia)
July 26, 2021 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carta, Raymond)
July 1, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa Brill, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Carta, Raymond)
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc..(McCormack, Michael)
June 14, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/26/2021 (DeRubeis, B.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc.. (McCormack, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. McCormack on behalf of Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc. (McCormack, Michael)
June 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Brill on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Brill, Melissa)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2021. (Lewis, D)
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc. served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Cannavino, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa Brill, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carta, Raymond)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 MOTION for Attorney Melissa Brill, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/25/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa Brill, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6520031) by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carta, Raymond)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: The parties in this case are advised that chambers copies of any document electronically filed that exceeds 20 pages, including exhibits, should be forwarded to Chambers of Judge Janet C. Hall, 141 Church Street, Room 107, New Haven, CT 06510. Single sided copies should be forwarded one business day after filing and must include the CMECF document identification heading on each page. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/24/2021.(DeRubeis, B.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Raymond Carta* *Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford* *707 Summer Street* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Reis, Julia)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit, filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order, #8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2021. Discovery due by 11/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Carta, Raymond)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wade Cannavino, Jr on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Cannavino, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent IAT Insurance Group, Inc for Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Carta, Raymond)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6518280.), filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company.(Carta, Raymond)
May 21, 2021 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 21, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Carta, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Krar & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond Carta
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?