NGM Insurance Company v. Eversource Energy Co
Plaintiff: NGM Insurance Company
Defendant: Eversource Energy Co, Eversource Energy Service Company, The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy and Connecticut Light & Power Company doing business as Eversource Energy
Case Number: 3:2021cv00759
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery shall be complete on or before 5/16/2022; the parties may file dispositive motions on or before 6/30/2022; the parties shall file their joint trial brief on or before 7/29/2022; and the case shall be trial ready on 9/1/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/28/21. (Codeanne, K.)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adams-Beman, Heather)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy.(Van Dyke, Amy)
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy, filed by NGM Insurance Company.(Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy, filed by NGM Insurance Company.(Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NGM Insurance Company. (Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Van Dyke on behalf of The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy (Van Dyke, Amy)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Connecticut Light & Power Company identifying Corporate Parent Eversource Energy for Connecticut Light & Power Company. (Heath, Honor)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Honor Southard Heath on behalf of The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy (Heath, Honor)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NGM Insurance Company. The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Connecticut Light & Power Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Heather Joy Adams-Beman* *Conway Stoughton LLC* *641 Farmington Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06105*. (Bozek, M.)
June 10, 2021 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2021. Discovery due by 12/2/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2022. See docket entry correction entered on 6/10 and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. (Bozek, M.)
June 10, 2021 Docket Entry Correction re #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. File date and signature date corrected to 6/2. In light of the correction to the file date, the deadlines were corrected as follows: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2021. Discovery due by 12/2/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2022. (Bozek, M.)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy, filed by NGM Insurance Company.(Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 8, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy. (Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eversource Energy Service Company, filed by NGM Insurance Company.(Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 7, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Eversource Energy Service Company. (Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eversource Energy Co* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Heather Joy Adams-Beman* *Conway Stoughton LLC* *641 Farmington Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06105*. (Bozek, M.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by NGM Insurance Company, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2021.(Bozek, M.)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 6/2/2021.(Bozek, M.)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2021. Discovery due by 12/2/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/2/2021.(Bozek, M.) Modified on 6/4/2021 to correct file date, signature date, and deadlines (Bozek, M.).
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eversource Energy Co ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6529813.), filed by NGM Insurance Company.(Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 2, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Eversource Energy Co. (Adams-Beman, Heather)
June 2, 2021 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGM Insurance Company v. Eversource Energy Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversource Energy Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversource Energy Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Energy
Represented By: Amy L. Van Dyke
Represented By: Honor Southard Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Light & Power Company doing business as Eversource Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NGM Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Joy Adams-Beman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?