Juracek v. Capcom Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Judy A Juracek
Defendant: Capcom U.S.A., Inc., CAPCOM CO., LTD. and Capcom USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00775
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Capcom Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 9/19/2021 filed by Judy A Juracek. (Winter, Jonathan) Modified on 7/1/2021 to correct answer due date (Bozek, M.).
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Capcom USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021 filed by Judy A Juracek. (Winter, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 Docket Entry Correction re #10 Waiver of Service Executed. Answer due date corrected to 9/19/2021. (Bozek, M.)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Capcom Co., Ltd., Capcom USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan Adam Winter* *St. Onge Steward Johnston & Reens LLC* *986 Bedford Street* *Stamford, CT 06905*. (Peterson, M)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Judy A Juracek, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Report on Copyright Form, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Judy A Juracek Signed by Clerk on 06/08/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/04/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Clerk on 06/04/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2021. Discovery due by 12/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2022. Signed by Clerk on 06/04/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 4, 2021 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 AO 121 Report on the re: Copyright Form Completed. (Winter, Jonathan)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Adam Winter on behalf of Judy A Juracek (Winter, Jonathan)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPCOM CO., LTD., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6534238.), filed by Judy A Juracek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Winter, Jonathan)
June 4, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Winter, Jonathan)
June 4, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to CAPCOM CO., LTD.. (Winter, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juracek v. Capcom Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capcom U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPCOM CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capcom USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A Juracek
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?