Anderson v. Corrections et al
Petitioner: Lonnie Anderson
Respondent: Commissioner of Corrections and State of Connecticut
Case Number: 3:2021cv00825
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. See attached. Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2021. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/22/2021. (Cahill, Leslie)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See attached Ruling. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/22/2021. (Cahill, Leslie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lonnie Anderson. (Fanelle, N.)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/17/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/17/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lonnie Anderson.(Fazekas, J.)
June 17, 2021 Filing fee received from Lonnie Anderson: $5.00, receipt number 467956. (Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lonnie Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?