Gianetti, M.D. v. New England Life Ins Co
Plaintiff: Charles D Gianetti
Defendant: New England Life Ins Co
Case Number: 3:2021cv00858
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Shawn)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by New England Life Ins Co.Responses due by 8/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Shawn)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. A response shall be filed on or before July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/1/2021. (Banker, Joshua)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2021 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by New England Life Ins Co. (Smith, Shawn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by New England Life Ins Co, #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by New England Life Ins Co, #2 Statement in Support of Removal filed by New England Life Ins Co, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by New England Life Ins Co, #7 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 06/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2021. Discovery due by 12/23/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2022. Signed by Clerk on 06/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New England Life Ins Co identifying Corporate Parent Brighthouse Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Brighthouse Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for New England Life Ins Co. (Smith, Shawn) Modified on 6/23/2021 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by New England Life Ins Co (Notice of Pending Motions) (Smith, Shawn) Modified on 6/23/2021 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by New England Life Ins Co (Statement in Support of Removal) (Smith, Shawn) Modified on 6/23/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New England Life Ins Co from Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV21-6107492-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6554417, filed byNew England Life Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Shawn) Modified on 6/23/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
June 23, 2021 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gianetti, M.D. v. New England Life Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D Gianetti
Represented By: Kenneth A. Votre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Life Ins Co
Represented By: Shawn Stephen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?