R. et al v. Greenwich Board of Education
Plaintiff: MR, RR, WR, R. R. and W. R.
Defendant: Greenwich Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2021cv00873
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Greenwich Board of Education waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/18/2021 filed by R. R.; W. R.. (McMahon, Gerry)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greenwich Board of Education* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gerry A. McMahon* *The Law Offices of Gerry McMahon, LLC* *100 Mill Plain Road, Suite 301* *Danbury, CT 06811*. (Reis, Julia)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by R. R., W. R., #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2021. (Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/24/2021. (Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/24/2021. (Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/24/2021. (Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2021. Discovery due by 12/24/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2021. (Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2021 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6557100.), filed by W.R., R.R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Admin Final Dec & Order)(McMahon, Gerry) Modified on 6/25/2021 o correct parties (Anastasio, F.).
June 24, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Greenwich Board of Education. (McMahon, Gerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. et al v. Greenwich Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR
Represented By: Gerry A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RR
Represented By: Gerry A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WR
Represented By: Gerry A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. R.
Represented By: Gerry A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. R.
Represented By: Gerry A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?