Hernandez v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Christine Hernandez
Defendant: Kinnary Patel and 2K16 Restaurants LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00877
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to 2K16 Restaurants LLC waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021; Kinnary Patel waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021 filed by Christine Hernandez. (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Christine Hernandez, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order For Fair Labor Standards Act Cases Not Pleaded as Collective Actions Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/25/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/25/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/25/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2021. Discovery due by 12/25/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2022. Signed by Clerk on 06/25/2021. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6557903.), filed by Christine Hernandez.(Garcia Quintner, Maria)
June 25, 2021 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinnary Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2K16 Restaurants LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Hernandez
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?