Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Gulf Oil Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Gulf Oil Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2021cv00932
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian Coghill to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6569189) by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Crowley, James)
August 26, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) James Crowley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6569203) by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Crowley, James)
August 24, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas H. Howell on behalf of Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Howell, Nicholas)
August 24, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Rosario Toledo on behalf of Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Toledo, Carmen)
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas H. Howell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6616099) by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership. (Daniels, Benjamin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carmen R. Toledo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6616077) by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership. (Daniels, Benjamin)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carmen R. Toledo ; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas H. Howell. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas H. Howell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6616099) by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership. (Daniels, Benjamin)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carmen R. Toledo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6616077) by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership. (Daniels, Benjamin)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Marin Lautier on behalf of Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Lautier, Sandra)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting on consent #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file a response to the complaint on or before September 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/4/2021. (D'Amato, Joseph)
August 4, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Defendant Gulf Oil Limited Partnership to 9/20/2021. (D'Amato, Joseph)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 20, 2021 to respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership. (Daniels, Benjamin)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Daniels on behalf of Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Daniels, Benjamin)
July 21, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Gulf Oil Limited Partnership to 8/6/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. All Defendants. (Tsuda, Kenta)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Gulf Oil Limited Partnership* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kenta Tsuda* *Conservation Law Foundation* *62 Summer Street* *Boston, MA 02110*. (Fanelle, N.)
July 12, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Tsuda, Kenta)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James Crowley. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 07/8/2021. (Fazekas, J.)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ian Coghill. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 07/8/2021. (Fazekas, J.)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc., #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian Coghill to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6569189) filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc., #7 Standing Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) James Crowley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6569203) filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 07/7/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 07/7/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 07/7/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2021. Discovery due by 1/6/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2022. Signed by Clerk on 07/7/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) James Crowley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6569203) by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Tsuda, Kenta)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian Coghill to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6569189) by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Tsuda, Kenta)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Tsuda, Kenta)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gulf Oil Limited Partnership ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6568868.), filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Intent, #3 Exhibit SWPPP, #4 Exhibit AST App, #5 Exhibit Berm App)(Tsuda, Kenta)
July 7, 2021 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Hushin, Z.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Gulf Oil Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kenta Tsuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Oil Limited Partnership
Represented By: Benjamin M. Daniels
Represented By: Carmen Rosario Toledo
Represented By: Nicholas H. Howell
Represented By: Sandra Marin Lautier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?