Purcell v. Hales Court Housing, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Purcell
Defendant: Hales Court Housing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01068
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 3:00 PM Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2021 Discovery due by 3/31/2022 Following a pre-filing conference, Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2022 Status Report due by 3/14/2022 Trial Ready Date 11/1/2022.(Tooker, Aimee)
September 23, 2021 Filing 26 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Labrencis, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hales Court Housing, LLC.(Kushel, Rachel)
September 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A video settlement conference is set for 10/20/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Fries, J.)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: A video settlement conference is scheduled for 10/20/21 at 10:30 AM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Zoom instructions have been provided to Counsel via email. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 9/1/2021. (Fries, J.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, on consent, to 9/13/21. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/31/21. (Tooker, Aimee)
August 31, 2021 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/13/2021 to Respond to Complaint by Hales Court Housing, LLC. (Kushel, Rachel)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the colloquy with counsel 8/13/21, the following is ordered: (1) The parties' hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, set down for 8/16/21 at 1:00 p.m., is continued without date by agreement. (2) The parties are referred to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. (3) A joint status report shall be filed three days following the parties' last settlement conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/13/21.(Tooker, Aimee)
August 13, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet Bond Arterton: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/13/2021. Total Time: 11 minutes (Barry, Donna)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/13/21. (Barry, Donna)
August 12, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Jessica Purcell. (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg J. Kirschner on behalf of Jessica Purcell (Kirschner, Greg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Marin Lautier on behalf of Hales Court Housing, LLC (Lautier, Sandra)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Heath on behalf of Hales Court Housing, LLC (Heath, Edward)
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Volkman Kushel on behalf of Hales Court Housing, LLC (Kushel, Rachel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause by Counsel, filed by Jessica Purcell. (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 12, 2021 A telephonic status conference will be held 8/13/21 at 10:00 a.m. as follows: 1-877-402-9753; access code: 3535720. (Tooker, Aimee)
August 12, 2021 Telephonic status conference set down for 8/13/21 will be held at 9:30 a.m. (Tooker, Aimee)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Based upon Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support thereof, and on the supporting documents attached thereto, including the sworn declaration of Attorney Jessica Labrencis regarding notice, the following is ordered by this Court: To Defendant Hales Court Housing, LLC: Based upon the complaint filed in this action, you are ordered to appear on Monday, August 16, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. in the United States District Court, District of Connecticut located at 141 Church Street, Courtroom 2, New Haven, Connecticut, to show cause why a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction pending trial of this action should not be ordered restraining and enjoining you, your employees, agents, or any other persons acting with you or on your behalf from: (1)Commencing or proceeding with any eviction proceeding against Ms. Purcell and her family; (2)Otherwise preventing Ms. Purcell and her family from continuing to occupy their home; and (3) Otherwise attempting to prevent Ms. Purcell and her family from keeping the support animals that are used by household members with disabilities. This Order to Show Cause shall be served on Defendant no later than August 12, 2021, by 5:00 p.m. Proof of such service shall be electronically filed no later than August 13, 2021. Any reply papers may be filed by Defendant no than 9:00 a.m. August 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/11/21.(Tooker, Aimee)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, Exhibits A-L, Affidavit of Jessica Purcell, Text of Proposed Order, Affidavit of Service by Counsel, Doc. Nos. 4-7 on 8/9/2021, filed by Jessica Purcell. (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Purcell. Hales Court Housing, LLC served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hales Court Housing, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica Leigh Labrencis* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *60 Popieluszko Court* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Reis, Julia)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Jessica Purcell, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jessica Purcell, #3 Affidavit filed by Jessica Purcell, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/5/2021. (Reis, Julia)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/5/2021. (Reis, Julia)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/5/2021. (Reis, Julia)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2021. Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/5/2021. (Reis, Julia)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Counsel Signed By Jessica Labrencis filed by Jessica Purcell. (Labrencis, Jessica)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Jessica Purcell.Responses due by 8/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit of Jessica Purcell, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Labrencis, Jessica)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hales Court Housing, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6601513.), filed by Jessica Purcell.(Labrencis, Jessica)
August 5, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
August 5, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hales Court Housing, LLC. (Labrencis, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purcell v. Hales Court Housing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Purcell
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Labrencis
Represented By: Greg J. Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hales Court Housing, LLC
Represented By: Edward J. Heath
Represented By: Rachel Volkman Kushel
Represented By: Sandra Marin Lautier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?