Lu et al v. Diamond Nail & Spa CT Inc et al
Plaintiff: Shangming Lu and Maria Olga Lliguicota
Defendant: Yan Zhi Liu, Yue Zhu Chen, Diamond Nail & Spa CT Inc doing business as Diamond Nail & Spa, Yanzhi Liu, Yuezhu Chen and Michelle Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01073
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Yue Zhu Chen to 10/8/2021; Yan Zhi Liu to 10/8/2021. (Perez, J.)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint until October 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/13/2021. (Lee, Diana)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint until October 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/13/2021. (Lee, Diana)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time for 21 days to file answer #1 Complaint, by Yan Zhi Liu. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time for 21 days to file answer #1 Complaint, by Yue Zhu Chen. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 Appearance Self Represented Party by Yue Zhu Chen (Payton, R.)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 Appearance Self Represented Party by Yan Zhi Liu (Payton, R.)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shangming Lu, Maria Olga Lliguicota. Yue Zhu Chen served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021; Diamond Nail & Spa CT Inc served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021; Yan Zhi Liu served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
August 23, 2021 Docket Entry Correction: The order of transfer (Doc. # 7 ) docket entry was updated to correct the judge that entered the order. (Barry, Donna)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/19/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/19/21. (Barry, Donna) Modified on 8/23/2021 - corrected judge (Barry, Donna).
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yue Zhu Chen, Diamond Nail & Spa CT Inc, Michelle Doe, Yan Zhi Liu* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Troy* *Troy Law, PLLC* *41-25 Kissena Blvd., Suite 103* *Flushing, NY 11355*. (Freberg, B)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Maria Olga Lliguicota, Shangming Lu. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/9/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/9/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2021; Discovery due by 2/8/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /gd against YUE ZHU CHEN, DIAMOND NAIL & SPA CT INC, MICHELLE DOE, YAN ZHI LIU ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6604566.), filed by Shangming Lu, Maria Olga Lliguicota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Document Preservation Demand /gd, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice of Lien and Assignment /gd, #3 Exhibit 03 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under FLSA and CTWA /gd, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice that Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited /gd)(Troy, John)
August 9, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to YUE ZHU CHEN, DIAMOND NAIL & SPA CT INC, MICHELLE DOE, YAN ZHI LIU. /gd (Troy, John)
August 9, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lu et al v. Diamond Nail & Spa CT Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Zhi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yue Zhu Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Nail & Spa CT Inc doing business as Diamond Nail & Spa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanzhi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuezhu Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shangming Lu
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Olga Lliguicota
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?