Columbia Casualty Company et al v. Nash Engineering Co
Plaintiff: Columbia Casualty Company and Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Nash Engineering Co
Case Number: 3:2021cv01075
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nash Engineering Co identifying Corporate Parent Nash Engineering Holdings LLC for Nash Engineering Co, Nash Engineering Co. (Zola, Jared)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company by Nash Engineering Co.(Zola, Jared)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 10/5/2021 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/14/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until October 5, 2021 TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #1 Complaint by Nash Engineering Co. (Zola, Jared)
September 14, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Nash Engineering Co to 10/5/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/17/2021 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/31/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/17/21to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Nash Engineering Co. (Zola, Jared)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Zola on behalf of Nash Engineering Co (Zola, Jared)
August 31, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Nash Engineering Co to 9/17/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Declaratory Judgment Complaint served on The Nash Engineering Company on 08/13/2021, filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company. (O'Connor, Kevin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nash Engineering Co* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin J. O'Connor* *Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing, P.C.,-Boston* *265 Franklin St., 7th Floor* *Boston, MA 02110-3113*. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 11, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Nash Engineering Co. (O'Connor, Kevin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Exhibit filed by Columbia Casualty Company, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Columbia Casualty Company, #7 Standing Protective Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Columbia Casualty Company, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/9/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/9/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2021, Discovery due by 2/8/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 EXHIBIT (CIVIL COVER SHEET) by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company re #1 Complaint. (O'Connor, Kevin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. (O'Connor, Kevin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Casualty Company. (O'Connor, Kevin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Declaratory Judgment) against The Nash Engineering Company ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6605238.), filed by Columbia Casualty Company, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company.(O'Connor, Kevin)
August 9, 2021 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Casualty Company et al v. Nash Engineering Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Casualty Company
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Co
Represented By: Jared Zola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?