Constantine v. Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Angela Constantine
Defendant: Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01153
Filed: August 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Defendant removed this action on August 29, 2021, and filed an appearance on that same date. See Docs. #1 , #2 . The Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting was due to be filed on or before October 12, 2021, that is, 44 days after defendant's appearance. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 26(f)(1) ("Within thirty days after the first appearance of a defendant, the attorneys of record... who have appeared in the case shall confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). The conference ordinarily shall be initiated by the plaintiff, and may be conducted by telephone or electronic audio or video conferencing service. Within fourteen (14) days after the conference, the participants shall jointly complete and file a report in the form prescribed by Form 26(f), which appears in the Appendix to these Rules."). To date, the parties have not filed the Rule 26(f) Report. Accordingly, on or before November 10, 2021, the parties shall confer and file the Rule 26(f) Report in compliance with the Local and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/20/2021. (Katz, S.)
October 20, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/10/2021. (Katz, S.)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2021.(Anastasio, F.)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Certification of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court filed by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC, #9 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC, #3 Notice No Pending Motions in State Court filed by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC, #5 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases filed by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Knight Adams on behalf of Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/29/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/29/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2021. Discovery due by 2/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/4/2022. Signed by Clerk on 08/29/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2021 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC Certification of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Adams, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Adams, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC. (Adams, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC No Pending Motions in State Court (Adams, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Knight Adams on behalf of Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC (Adams, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC from Superior Court of the State of Connecticut, Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV21-6145548-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BCTDC-6627832, filed by Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC.(Adams, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constantine v. Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Constantine
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Merchant Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Knight Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?