Post University Inc v. Course Hero, Inc.
Plaintiff: Post University Inc
Defendant: Course Hero, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01242
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Post University Inc. Course Hero, Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Johnson, Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Course Hero, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Timothy Andrew Johnson* *Getz Balich LLC* *10 Waterside Drive, Suite 205* *Farmington, CT 06032*. (Gutierrez, Y.)
November 1, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Course Hero, Inc.. (Johnson, Timothy)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Post University Inc, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Report on Patent/Trademark Form, #1 Complaint, filed by Post University Inc, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Gutierrez, Y.)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/17/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/17/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2021; Discovery due by 3/19/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2022. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
September 17, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Post University Inc. (Johnson, Timothy)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Course Hero, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6654115.), filed by Post University Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 AO 120, #3 AO 121, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38)(Johnson, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post University Inc v. Course Hero, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Post University Inc
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Course Hero, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?