Cooke v. Kenny et al
Plaintiff: Ian T. Cooke
Defendant: Thomas Kenny, Robert Major and Bonnie Hakins
Case Number: 3:2021cv01244
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Partial Stay by Ian T. Cooke.Responses due by 12/8/2021 (Carr, Dave)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomas Kenny, filed by Ian T. Cooke.(Pesta, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2021: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF with file stamp) (Pesta, J.).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 9/29/21. (Payton, R.)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ONPRISONER ELECTRON IC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/20/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ian T. Cooke. (Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ian T. Cooke. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Re: IFP)(Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Bonnie Hakins, Thomas Kenny, Robert Major, filed by Ian T. Cooke. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooke v. Kenny et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian T. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Hakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?