Botti v. Yale University
Plaintiff: Valentina Botti
Defendant: Yale University
Case Number: 3:2021cv01304
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
November 18, 2021 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/29/2021 (Gould, K.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yale University waiver sent on 10/8/2021, answer due 12/7/2021 filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Yale University (Noonan, Patrick)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner on behalf of Valentina Botti (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel J Seiden* *Monarch Law* *1 Schooner Lane Ste Unit 1c* *Milford, CT 06460*. (Fazekas, J.)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Valentina Botti, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2021. Discovery due by 4/2/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yale University ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6670444.), filed by Valentina Botti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- ROJ)(Seiden, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Yale University. (Seiden, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botti v. Yale University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Botti
Represented By: Daniel J Seiden
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale University
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?