James et al v. Venture Home Solar, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kurt James, Julie Stewart and Zaker Ahmed
Defendant: Venture Home Solar, LLC, Venture Commercial NYC, LLC and Venture Solar Commercial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01306
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 30, 2021 to file Answer or Responsive Motion #1 Complaint by Venture Home Solar, LLC, Venture Solar Commercial, LLC. (Freier, Harris)
November 29, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Harris Samuel Freier on behalf of Venture Home Solar, LLC, Venture Solar Commercial, LLC (Freier, Harris)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Thomas Lopez-Jacobs on behalf of Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Milz on behalf of Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart (Milz, Andrew)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 11/18/2021. (Freberg, B)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jody T. Lopez-Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6726968) by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jody T. Lopez-Jacobs, #2 Exhibit A--Lopez-Jacobs Certificates of Good Standing)(Lesser, Seth)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Cary L. Flitter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6726911) by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cary L. Flitter, #2 Exhibit A--Flitter Certificates of Good Standing)(Lesser, Seth)
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew M. Milz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6726862) by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew M. Milz, #2 Exhibit A--Milz Certificates of Good Standing)(Lesser, Seth)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Venture Home Solar, LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021; Venture Solar Commercial, LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021 filed by Zaker Ahmed; Kurt James; Julie Stewart. (Alimehri, Amir)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Venture Commercial NYC, LLC by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart (Alimehri, Amir)
October 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amir Alimehri on behalf of Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart (Alimehri, Amir)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Klafter on behalf of Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart (Klafter, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear for Attorney(s) Amir Alimehri to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2021. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Attorney Jeffrey A. Klafter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/21. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Amir Alimehri to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6677739) by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amir Alimehri, #2 Exhibit A--Alimehri Certificate of Good Standing)(Lesser, Seth)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey A. Klafter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6677722) by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey A. Klafter, #2 Exhibit A--Klafter Certificate of Good Standing)(Lesser, Seth)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Julie Stewart, Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Julie Stewart, Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 10/4/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2021; Discovery due by 4/5/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2022. Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
October 1, 2021 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart re #1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet) (Lesser, Seth)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number BCTDC-6670836.), filed by Zaker Ahmed, Kurt James, Julie Stewart.(Lesser, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Venture Home Solar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt James
Represented By: Seth R. Lesser
Represented By: Amir Alimehri
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Klafter
Represented By: Andrew M Milz
Represented By: Jody Thomas Lopez-Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Stewart
Represented By: Seth R. Lesser
Represented By: Amir Alimehri
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Klafter
Represented By: Andrew M Milz
Represented By: Jody Thomas Lopez-Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaker Ahmed
Represented By: Seth R. Lesser
Represented By: Amir Alimehri
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Klafter
Represented By: Andrew M Milz
Represented By: Jody Thomas Lopez-Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Home Solar, LLC
Represented By: Harris Samuel Freier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Commercial NYC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Solar Commercial, LLC
Represented By: Harris Samuel Freier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?