Poteat v. Hartford Housing et al
Plaintiff: Kennara Poteat
Defendant: Hartford Housing, Enfield Housing, CHRO, Giovanna Bacile, Shan Riddick, Margarita Palmer, Ben Bare, Department of Housing and Urban Development, Michelle Dumasker, Robert Zamlowski, Dryf Cynthia and Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
Case Number: 3:2021cv01432
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kennara Poteat. (Pesta, J.)
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kennara Poteat. (Pesta, J.)
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Reopen Case by Kennara Poteat.(Pesta, J.)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #12 ) in light of plaintiff's voluntary dismissal of case (Doc. #11 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/21. (Barry, Donna)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kennara Poteat. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 misc. note)(Pesta, J.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Kennara Poteat (Carr, Dave)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/1/21.(Barry, Donna)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/01/21. (Barry, Donna)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Giovanna Bacile, Ben Bare, Dryf Cynthia, Michelle Dumasker, Enfield Housing, Hartford Housing, Department of Housing and Urban Development, Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities, Margarita Palmer, Shan Riddick, Robert Zamlowski, filed by Kennara Poteat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carr, Dave)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 Consent to Electronic Notice by Kennara Poteat (Carr, Dave)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/29/2021.(Carr, Dave)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/29/2021.(Carr, Dave)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2021 Discovery due by 4/30/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2022 Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2021.(Carr, Dave)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION By Self-Represented Litigant To Participate in Electronic Filing Order by Kennara Poteat. (Carr, Dave)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kennara Poteat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carr, Dave)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHRO, Enfield Housing, Hartford Housing, filed by Kennara Poteat.(Carr, Dave)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poteat v. Hartford Housing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennara Poteat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enfield Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanna Bacile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarita Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Dumasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Zamlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dryf Cynthia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?