Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company et al v. New England Smart Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company and Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: New England Smart Energy, LLC and New England Smart Energy Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01548
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/25/2022 (Lewis, D)
January 11, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by New England Smart Energy Group, LLC.(Katon, Thomas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New England Smart Energy Group, LLC. (Katon, Thomas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Katon on behalf of New England Smart Energy Group, LLC (Katon, Thomas)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice ; granting #16 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2022. (Lewis, D)
December 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. O'Donnell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6754231) by Ace American Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crotta, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin J. Hughes to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6754214) by Ace American Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crotta, David)
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by New England Smart Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Ace American Insurance Company. New England Smart Energy Group, LLC served on 12/4/2021, answer due 12/25/2021. (Crotta, David)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *New England Smart Energy Group, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David J. Crotta, Jr.* *Mulvey, Oliver, Gould & Crotta* *2911 Dixwell Avenue* *Hamden, CT 06518*. (Freberg, B)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against New England Smart Energy Group, LLC, filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Ace American Insurance Company.(Crotta, David)
December 1, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to New England Smart Energy Group, LLC. (Crotta, David)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *New England Smart Energy, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David J. Crotta, Jr.* *Mulvey, Oliver, Gould & Crotta* *2911 Dixwell Avenue* *Hamden, CT 06518*. (Freberg, B)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Ace American Insurance Company, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, #1 Complaint, filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2021.(Freberg, B)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER Re Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2022; Discovery due by 5/21/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 6/25/2022. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Crotta, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc. for Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Crotta, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Ace American Insurance Company. (Crotta, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2021: #1 Replacement PDF) (Anastasio, F.).
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New England Smart Energy, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6729647.), filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)(Crotta, David) Modified on 11/19/2021 to correct parties (Anastasio, F.).
November 19, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to New England Smart Energy, LLC. (Crotta, David) Modified on 11/19/2021 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
November 19, 2021 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company et al v. New England Smart Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Crotta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Crotta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: David J. Crotta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Smart Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Smart Energy Group, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Katon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?