Olson v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Isaak Olson
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Karl L. Schultz and William G. Kelly
Case Number: 3:2021cv01631
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 14, 2022 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by William G. Kelly, Alejandro Mayorkas, Karl L. Schultz. (Pezzi, Stephen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of William G. Kelly, Alejandro Mayorkas, Karl L. Schultz (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 13, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ria Tabacco Mar, Linda S. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6750808) by Isaak Olson. (Tabacco Mar, Ria)
January 13, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ria Tabacco Mar, Linda S. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6750808) by Isaak Olson. (Morris, Linda)
December 17, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isaak Olson. All Defendants. (Wishnie, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Ria Tabacco Mar on behalf of Isaak Olson (Tabacco Mar, Ria)
December 16, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Morris on behalf of Isaak Olson (Morris, Linda)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-14-21. (Bryant, Vanessa)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-14-21. (Bryant, Vanessa)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-14-21. (Bryant, Vanessa)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-14-21. (Bryant, Vanessa)
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Appearance for Deepankar Gagneja by Isaak Olson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wishnie, Michael)
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Appearance for Michelle Fraling by Isaak Olson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wishnie, Michael)
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Appearance for Daisy Guilyard by Isaak Olson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wishnie, Michael)
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Appearances by Isaak Olson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wishnie, Michael)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Barrett on behalf of Isaak Olson (Barrett, Dan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elana Spungen Bildner on behalf of Isaak Olson (Bildner, Elana)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear for Attorneys Ria Tabacco Mar and Linda S. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 2/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
December 8, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *William G. Kelly, Alejandro Mayorkas, Karl L. Schultz* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Meghan Brooks* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Yale Law School* *P.O. Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Fazekas, J.)
December 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ria Tabacco Mar, Linda S. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6750808) by Isaak Olson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Bildner, Elana)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Elana Spungen Bildner on behalf of Isaak Olson, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Meghan Brooks on behalf of Isaak Olson, #1 Complaint filed by Isaak Olson, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 12/8/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/8/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/8/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/8/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elana Spungen Bildner on behalf of Isaak Olson (Bildner, Elana)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Brooks on behalf of Isaak Olson (Brooks, Meghan)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6750583.), filed by Isaak Olson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wishnie, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Wishnie, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaak Olson
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Represented By: Elana Spungen Bildner
Represented By: Meghan Brooks
Represented By: Dan Barrett
Represented By: Linda Morris
Represented By: Ria Tabacco Mar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl L. Schultz
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Kelly
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?