Save the Sound, Inc. v. Middletown
Plaintiff: Save the Sound, Inc.
Defendant: City of Middletown
Case Number: 3:2021cv01646
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court hereby approves and adopts the deadline proposed by the parties in #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall file its responsive pleading and the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report by April 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 02/1/2022. (Allums, Kenneshea)
February 1, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/1/2022. (Allums, Kenneshea)
January 31, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 1, 2022 to Respond to the Complaint and to file their Rule 26(f) Report Set Deadlines/Hearings, #1 Complaint by City of Middletown. (Hoffman, Lee)
January 19, 2022 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/3/2022 (Perez, J.)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee D. Hoffman on behalf of City of Middletown (Hoffman, Lee)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Stafstrom, Jr on behalf of City of Middletown (Stafstrom, Steven)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #3 Notice of Related Cases. In light of the courts order on Jan. 6, 2022 in 3:21-cv-01647-SVN (ECF #11). Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 01/13/2022.(Allums, Kenneshea)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Middletown waiver sent on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022 filed by City of Middletown. (Hoffman, Lee)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Related Case filed by Save the Sound, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Save the Sound, Inc., #1 Complaint filed by Save the Sound, Inc., #6 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 12/14/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 12/14/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2022 Discovery due by 6/15/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2022 Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Save the Sound, Inc. (Reynolds, Roger)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Save the Sound, Inc.. (Reynolds, Roger)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Middletown ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6755926.), filed by Save the Sound, Inc..(Reynolds, Roger)
December 13, 2021 Judge Omar A. Williams added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Save the Sound, Inc. v. Middletown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save the Sound, Inc.
Represented By: Roger F. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Middletown
Represented By: Lee D. Hoffman
Represented By: Steven J. Stafstrom, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?