Ohio Security Insurance Co. v. Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Defendant: Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01728
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/23/2022.(Perez, J.)
February 22, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 7/6/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Omar A. Williams (Wagner, Rebecca)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The court thanks the parties for submitting their Rule 26(f) Planning Report (ECF No. #18 ) and hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines and procedures proposed therein. All discovery shall be completed on or before July 3, 2023, and all interim discovery deadlines are hereby incorporated by reference. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before September 1, 2023. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before October 2, 2023, or within 30 days of the court's ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. The court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection on December 1, 2023. The court is unlikely to extend these deadlines absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. The parties having requested a settlement conference, the court hereby refers this action to a United States Magistrate Judge for that purpose. The Clerk of Court is respectfully asked to assign a Magistrate Judge to this case.A status conference will be held on July 6, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/22/22. (Wagner, Rebecca)
February 18, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Anthony Spadaccini on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Co. (Spadaccini, Louis)
February 17, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Cronmiller on behalf of Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc. (Cronmiller, Thomas)
February 17, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjeev Devabhakthuni on behalf of Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc. (Devabhakthuni, Sanjeev)
February 16, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Security Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation, Corporate Parent Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Corporate Parent The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company for Ohio Security Insurance Co.. (Spadaccini, Louis)
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Spadaccini, Louis)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas B. Cronmiller; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sanjeev Devabhakthuni. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
February 9, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sanjeev Devabhakthuni to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6825421) by Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.. (Yaqoob, Shaleem)
February 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sanjeev Devabhakthuni to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6825421) by Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed SDevabhakthuni Affidavit iso PHV Application)(Yaqoob, Shaleem)
February 9, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas B. Cronmiller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6825100) by Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.. (Yaqoob, Shaleem)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas B. Cronmiller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6825100) by Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Cronmiller Affidavit iso PHV Application)(Yaqoob, Shaleem)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle B. Rice ; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ron L. Pingitore. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/2/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ron L. Pingitore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6812999) by Ohio Security Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ron Pingitore)(Spadaccini, Louis)
January 31, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kyle B. Rice to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6811261) by Ohio Security Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kyle B. Rice)(Spadaccini, Louis)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.. (Yaqoob, Shaleem)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc..(Yaqoob, Shaleem)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaleem Yaqoob on behalf of Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc. (Yaqoob, Shaleem)
January 25, 2022 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2022 (Perez, J.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Co.. Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Spadaccini, Louis)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Louis Anthony Spadaccini* *Blackwell, Davis & Spadaccini, LLC* *158 East Center Street* *Manchester, CT 06040*. (Fazekas, J.)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Ohio Security Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 12/29/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 12/29/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 12/29/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/27/2022. Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/4/2022. Signed by Clerk on 12/29/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6774019.), filed by Ohio Security Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spadaccini, Louis) Modified on 12/29/2021 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
December 29, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Spadaccini, Louis) Modified on 12/29/2021 to correct summons request (Hushin, Z.).
December 29, 2021 Judge Omar A. Williams added. (Hushin, Z.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Co. v. Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Represented By: Louis Anthony Spadaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sanjeev Devabhakthuni
Represented By: Shaleem Yaqoob
Represented By: Thomas Cronmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?