One Rock Capital Partners, LLC v. Patane et al
Petitioner: One Rock Capital Partners, LLC
Respondent: Mark J. Patane, Julie Harding, Heather Harrigan, Stephen S. Shapiro, Catherine Porter, Erica Russell, Tina Moretti, Bridget Kopet, Jennifer S. Cole, Benjamin A. Fletcher and Diane Bogdan
Case Number: 3:2021mc00039
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 30 Joint STATUS REPORT Following Further Meet-and-Confer on Motions to Quash by Diane Bogdan, Jennifer S. Cole, Benjamin A. Fletcher, Julie Harding, Heather Harrigan, Bridget Kopet, Tina Moretti, One Rock Capital Partners, LLC, Mark J. Patane, Catherine Porter, Erica Russell, Stephen S. Shapiro. (Chou, Jenny)
September 8, 2021 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: MOTION. Held on 08/24/2021 before Judge S. DAVE VATTI. Court Reporter: eScribers. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2021. (Gottlieb, J)
September 8, 2021 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. Held on August 24, 2021 before Judge S. Dave Vatti. Court Reporter: Huseby. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2021. (Oliver, T.)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. In light of the discussions with the parties held during the oral argument and discovery conference held on August 24, 2021, as to the pending motion to quash subpoena [1, 15], the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report by September 15, 2021, identifying areas of agreement and those portions of the document requests and Rule 30(b)(6) deposition topics upon which they require a ruling by the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 8/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 24, 2021 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Oral Argument held on 8/24/2021 re #15 MOTION to Quash filed by One Rock Capital Partners, LLC. Total Time: 41 minutes(Court Reporter Huseby.) (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 6, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. An Oral Argument Hearing on pending Motions to Quash is scheduled for 8/24/21 at 1:00 p.m., via Zoom before Judge S. Dave Vatti. NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Oral Argument scheduled for 8/24/21 at 1:00 p.m. will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1604615584?pwd=MmxvUVRLNXJCNitYampGdGdrWWpqdz09 and call in number is +1 551 285 1373.Meeting ID: 160 461 5584 Meeting Password: 652576Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Ellis, Bernadette)
August 5, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Isaac Straus on behalf of Mark J. Patane et al., Respondents. (Straus, Max)
July 30, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Quash filed by One Rock Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chou, Jenny)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting consent #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Reply deadline extended until July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 7/21/21. (Arroyo, Alexandra)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti for ruling on Consent Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #20 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/21.(Barry, Donna)
July 19, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2021 of the deadline to file a reply to #13 Response,,, by One Rock Capital Partners, LLC. (Chou, Jenny)
July 16, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Max I. Straus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6577961) by Mark J. Patane. (Straus, Max)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Max I. Straus to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/13/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/15/2021. (Freberg, B)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Max I. Straus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6577961) by Diane Bogdan, Jennifer S. Cole, Benjamin A. Fletcher, Julie Harding, Heather Harrigan, Bridget Kopet, Tina Moretti, Mark J. Patane, Catherine Porter, Erica Russell, Stephen S. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Max I. Straus)(Raabe, Craig)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti for ruling on #15 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/13/21. (Barry, Donna)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Quash by One Rock Capital Partners, LLC.Responses due by 8/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Chou, Jenny)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/9/21.(Barry, Donna)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Quash by One Rock Capital Partners, LLC re #1 Motion to Quash '...' Respondents' Opposition to One Rock Capital Partners, LLC's Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Diane Bogdan, Jennifer S. Cole, Benjamin A. Fletcher, Julie Harding, Heather Harrigan, Bridget Kopet, Tina Moretti, Mark J. Patane, Catherine Porter, Erica Russell, Stephen S. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Declaration of Max I. Straus, #19 Exhibit A to Straus Declaration, #20 Exhibit B to Straus Declaration)(Raabe, Craig) Modified on 7/19/2021 (Reis, Julia).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/9/2021.(Perez, J.)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Raabe on behalf of Diane Bogdan, Jennifer S. Cole, Benjamin A. Fletcher, Julie Harding, Heather Harrigan, Bridget Kopet, Tina Moretti, Mark J. Patane, Catherine Porter, Erica Russell, Stephen S. Shapiro (Raabe, Craig)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 07/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 Case Electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-mc-00492. Modified on 7/8/2021 to correct docket text and file date (Hushin, Z.).
July 1, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Hushin, Z.)
July 1, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Connecticut.(nb)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER terminating #1 Motion to Quash; granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case. On June 18, 2021, Movant One Rock Capital Partners, LLC initiated this matter, a motion to quash a subpoena issued by the U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut in Patane v. Nestle Waters North Am., Inc., No. 17-cv-1381. (Dkt. No. 1.) On June 23, 2021, Movant filed a motion to transfer this matter to the District of Connecticut, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45(f). Rule 45(f) specifies that, [w]hen the court where compliance is required did not issue the subpoena, it may transfer a motion under this rule to the issuing court if the person subject to the subpoena consents. This Court is the court where compliance is required, and this Court did not issue the disputed subpoena. Movant, the party subject to the subpoena, consents to and actively requests the transfer. Movant's motion to transfer is granted.The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the District of Connecticut, to close the motions at Docket Numbers 1 and 6, and to close this case.. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/24/2021) (nb) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Connecticut. Document filed by One Rock Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support).(Chou, Jenny)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. RESPONDENTS SHALL OPPOSE THE MOTION TO QUASH ON OR BEFORE JULY 9, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(kye)(Text Only Order)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-01381 (JAM). (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24691 addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Nicholas Carullo dated June 22, 2021. Document filed by Diane Bogdan, Jennifer S. Cole, Benjamin A. Fletcher, Julie Harding, Heather Harrigan, Bridget Kopet, Tina Moretti, Mark J. Patane, Catherine Porter, Erica Russell, Stephen S. Shapiro..(Carullo, Nicholas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Carlo Carullo on behalf of Diane Bogdan, Jennifer S. Cole, Benjamin A. Fletcher, Julie Harding, Heather Harrigan, Bridget Kopet, Tina Moretti, Mark J. Patane, Catherine Porter, Erica Russell, Stephen S. Shapiro..(Carullo, Nicholas)
June 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (wb)
June 21, 2021 MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. .(wb)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Chou, Jenny)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoena . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-01381 (JAM). (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24691829)Document filed by One Rock Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Chou, Jenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Rock Capital Partners, LLC v. Patane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark J. Patane
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Max Isaac Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Julie Harding
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heather Harrigan
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen S. Shapiro
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine Porter
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erica Russell
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tina Moretti
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bridget Kopet
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer S. Cole
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Benjamin A. Fletcher
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane Bogdan
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: One Rock Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Jenny R. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?