Feighan v. Resource Systems Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vaughn Feighan
Defendant: Resource Systems Group, Inc., Daversa Partners and Paul Daversa
Petitioner: Robert Feighan
Case Number: 3:2021mc00061
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting (Doc. No. #12 ) Motion to Withdraw and withdrawing (Doc. No. #1 ) Motion to Quash Subpoena. Accordingly, the discovery conference set for today (Doc. No. 11 ) is canceled. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 10/14/2021. (Watson, M.)
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (paid $49 fee; receipt number ACTDC-6617542) by Robert Feighan. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 10/6/2021At the request of counsel, the Discovery Conference regarding the Motion to Quash has been rescheduled to 10/14/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the same connection details in the Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom for the 10/6/21 conference. (Watson, M.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Attorney John O. Farley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/30/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2021. (Freberg, B)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) John O. Farley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6669115) by Robert Feighan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shapiro, Jonathan)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Discovery Conference regarding the Motion to Quash is set for 10/6/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector.Please see the Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom for connection instructions. (Watson, M.)
September 30, 2021 NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Discovery Conference on the Motion to Quash is scheduled for 10/6/2021 at 2:00 PM will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1609735833?pwd=RTdIVTQydFVNeXorWklzeVI5c2hWUT09 and call in number is 1 646 828 7666.Meeting ID: 160 973 5833 Meeting Password: 037365Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Any member of the public may view this matter but using this Zoom link or the meeting ID and password above. (Watson, M.)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Motion including #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (paid $49 fee; receipt number ACTDC-6617542). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/28/2021. Motions referred to Robert M. Spector. (DeRubeis, B.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTION re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (paid $49 fee; receipt number ACTDC-6617542) by Resource Systems Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Cannavino, John)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Cannavino on behalf of Resource Systems Group, Inc. (Cannavino, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION re 2 Order to Show Cause,,, CONCERNING SERVICE by Robert Feighan. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On August 19, 2021, movant, Robert Feighan, filed a Motion to Quash Subpoena issued by the defendant, Resource Systems Group, Inc., dated July 23, 2021, in the case of Vaughn Feighan v. Resource Systems Group, Inc., pending in U.S. District Court, for the District of Columbia, (Doc. No. 1). The defendant in the underlying case, Resource Systems Group, Inc., is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by September 20, 2021, why this Motion to Quash should not be granted. Movant, Robert Feighan, is given until September 7, 2021 to serve this Order to Show Cause on Resource Systems Group, Inc., and docket proof of such service by September 10, 2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/23/2021. (Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2021) (DeRubeis, B.)
August 19, 2021 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (paid $49 fee; receipt number ACTDC-6617542), filed by Robert Feighan.Responses due by 9/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Affidavit)(Shapiro, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feighan v. Resource Systems Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Feighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resource Systems Group, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Cannavino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daversa Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Daversa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Feighan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?