In Re: Belparts Group, N.V.
Petitioner: Belparts, N.V.
Not Classified By Court: Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc and Belimo USA
In Re: Belparts Group, N.V.
Case Number: 3:2021mc00062
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1782
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Everton on behalf of Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc (Everton, Benjamin)
October 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Sganga, Jr on behalf of Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc (Sganga, John)
October 18, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin J. Everton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6685718) by Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc. (Cordani, John)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) John B. Sganga, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6685712) by Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc. (Cordani, John)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin J. Everton, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2021. (Imbriani, Susan)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John B. Sganga, Jr., Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2021. (Imbriani, Susan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin J. Everton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6685718) by Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Benjamin J. Everton)(Cordani, John)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) John B. Sganga, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6685712) by Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Sganga)(Cordani, John)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Quash or in the Alternative to Vacate or Stay filed by Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cordani, John)
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Quash or in the Alternative to Vacate or Stay filed by Belparts Group, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Casino, Joseph)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Any response to the motion to quash shall be due by October 11, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. EST, and any reply to any response to the motion to quash shall be due by October 13, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. EST. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/07/2021. (Dalton, A.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash or in the Alternative to Vacate or Stay by Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc.Responses due by 10/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Dr. Constant Van Nispen, #3 Affidavit Dr. Nora Wessendorf, #4 Affidavit John Sganga, #5 Exhibit 1 to John Sganga Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to John Sganga Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to John Sganga Declaration)(Cordani, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Cordani on behalf of Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc (Cordani, John)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. In light of the Court's ruling, ECF No. #5 , the Court adopts in large part the Proposed Protective Order. Provisions relating to "Potential Foreign Proceedings" have been removed. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/13/2021. (Dalton, A).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Ex Parte Motion for Discovery in Aid of Foreign Litigation Pursuant to 28 USC 1782. For the reasons described in the attached Order, the Court GRANTS the Application for discovery under 28 U.S.C. 1782. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/13/2021. (Dalton, A.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of Belparts, N.V. (Doroghazi, John)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 08/23/2021.(Carr, Dave)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 EXPARTE MOTION for Discovery in Aid of Foreign Litigation Pursuant to 28 USC 1782 by Belparts, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-E)(Carr, Dave)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Belparts Group, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Belimo Aircontrols (USA), Inc
Represented By: John Cordani
Represented By: Benjamin J Everton
Represented By: John B. Sganga, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Belimo USA
Represented By: John Cordani
Represented By: Benjamin J Everton
Represented By: John B. Sganga, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Belparts Group, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Belparts, N.V.
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: Joseph Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?